Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Jensen, Markus William, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Cleburne County, AR, . Cleburne County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2021 |
CategoryDe - Decedent Estate Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCleburne County, AR |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | REPORT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTERS TESTAMENTARY | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.