Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Paul, Jeanna, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Paul, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Conway County, AR, . Conway County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2015 |
CategoryDv - Divorce |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationConway County, AR |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2015 | Docket Event | UNCONTEST DIVRCE HEARING HELD | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | DOCKET TEXT | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | DECREE OF DIVORCE | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | MOD DIVORCE GRANTED | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF PROTECT HEARING CANC | |
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event | UNCONTEST DIVRCE HEARING SCHED | |
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF PROTECT HEARING SCHED | |
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.