Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cannon Finance Inc, filed a(n) Do - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) case against Dunbar, Shakendra Yulice, in the jurisdiction of Garland County, AR, . Garland County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 19, 2019 |
CategoryDo - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationGarland County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-DEFAULT | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED | |
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.