Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hall, Deborah Racheal, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Toth, Bradley S, in the jurisdiction of Izard County, AR, . Izard County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2016 |
CategoryDv - Divorce |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationIzard County, AR |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CUSTODY SUPPORT INFORMATION | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURT ASSISTANT NOTE | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.