Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Askeland, Ashley, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Askeland, Kenneth John,Jr, in the jurisdiction of Izard County, AR, . Izard County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 17, 2021 |
CategoryDv - Divorce |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationIzard County, AR |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | OCSE WAGE NOTICE | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | OCSE WAGE NOTICE | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | DECREE OF DIVORCE | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURT ASSISTANT NOTE | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURT ASSISTANT NOTE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.