Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sims, James, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Lonoke County, AR, . Lonoke County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2017 |
CategoryDe - Decedent Estate Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLonoke County, AR |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.