Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MARY MITCHNER V TRAVIS MITCHNER -NON-TRIAL
On February 17, 2016 a da - order of protection case was filed by Decker, Mary Elizabeth, against Mitchner, Travis T, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, AR.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 17, 2016
Last Refreshed
October 09, 2022
Filing Location
Marion County, AR
Category
DA - ORDER OF PROTECTION
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF PROTECT HEARING HELD | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF PROTECT HEARING SCHED | |
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL | |
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED |