Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
15Th Circuit Division 3 filed a(n) Om - Civil - Other case against Bail Bond Financing Inc, in the jurisdiction of Scott County, AR, . Scott County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2013 |
CategoryOm - Civil - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationScott County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION HEARING HELD | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED | |
October 15, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED | |
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event | BOND FORFEITURE SUMMONS | |
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.