Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Of Arkansas, filed a(n) Om - Civil - Other case against Bail Bond Financing, in the jurisdiction of Scott County, AR, . Scott County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2016 |
CategoryOm - Civil - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationScott County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION DISMISS | |
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event | BOND FORFEITURE HEARING HELD | |
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event | BOND FORFEITURE HEARING SCHED | |
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event | BOND FORFEITURE HEARING CONTD | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTE | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | BOND FORFEITURE HEARING SCHED | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | BOND FORFEITURE HEARING CONTD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.