Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Frymire, Hunter Earl, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Davis, Haley Leanne, in the jurisdiction of Woodruff County, AR, . Woodruff County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2018 |
CategoryPt - Paternity |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWoodruff County, AR |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-DISMISS RULE 41 | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE DISMISS RULE 41 | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER | |
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT HEARING HELD | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MTN COMPEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.