Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MIDLAND FUNDING VS CUREVAC
On April 28, 2021 a commercial case was filed by Midland Funding, represented by Hammer, Isaac L, against Curevac, Irfan, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA. Judge Beth M. Andrus presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 28, 2021
Last Refreshed
December 02, 2022
Filing Location
King County, WA
Category
Commercial
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | STFJG - Satisfaction of Judgment | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | AFGAR - Affidavit For Garnishment |
|
October 21, 2013 | Scheduled Trial Calendar | ||
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event | EXP0006 EX-PARTE, DEPT. KENT - CLERK | |
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event | MTFEJD - Motion and Affidavit for Examination of Judgment Debtor |
|
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event | ORCD - Order Compelling Discovery |
|
September 07, 2012 | Kent Supplemental Proceedings | ||
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event | ACTION SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS | |
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event | NTMTDK - Note for Motion Docket |
|
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event | ORSUP - Order Regarding Supplemental Proceedings |
|
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event | EXP0007 EX-PARTE, DEPT. SEATTLE - CLERK | |
July 18, 2012 | Docket Event | MTFEJD - Motion and Affidavit for Examination of Judgment Debtor |
|
July 18, 2012 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED 20.00 | |
July 18, 2012 | Docket Event | NTHG - Notice of Hearing |
|
July 18, 2012 | Docket Event | ACTION SUPPL PROCEEDINGS | |
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event | EXP0007 EX-PARTE, DEPT. SEATTLE - CLERK | |
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event | DFJG - Default Judgment |
|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event | AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service |
|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event | MTDJ - Motion for Default Judgment |
|
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet |
|
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | JDG0035 JUDGE BETH M. ANDRUS, DEPT 35 | |
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | *ORSCS - Order Setting Case Schedule |
|
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | LOCK ORIGINAL LOCATION - KENT | |
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | SMCMP - Summons and Complaint |
|