Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Johnson, Allison M F, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Johnson, Rashad J, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with Samuel S. Chung presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution No Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
XJCD - JIS Check Confidential Document Cover Sheet
Date: January 11, 2021MTHRG - Motion Hearing
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00WPSL - Working Papers Submission List
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00NTMTDK - Note for Motion Docket
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00WPSL - Working Papers Submission List
Date: January 14, 2021LIST - List
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Motion hearing
Date: January 19, 2021DCD - Decree of Dissolution
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00ORC - Order to Compel
Date: January 19, 2021CR - Certificate
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00MTCM - Motion to Compel
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00FAULTY - Faulty Document Notice
Date: December 30, 2020AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: December 29, 2020ORSBM - Order RE: Service by US Mail
Date: December 29, 2020FNFCL - Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00AFML - Affidavit of Mailing
Date: January 14, 2021DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00MTSM - Motion to Serve by Mail
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00NTMTDK - Note for Motion Docket
Date: 2016-03-31T00:00:00CIF - Confidential Information Form
Date: 2016-03-31T00:00:00PTDSS - Petition for Dissolution
Date: 2016-03-31T00:00:00*ORSCS - Order Setting Case Schedule
Date: 2016-03-31T00:00:00ORPRFP - Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Date: 2016-03-31T00:00:00CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: 2016-03-31T00:00:00MTWVF - Motion for Waiver of Fees
Date: 2016-03-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.