Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
State Of Washington, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Whiteway Jackson, Dajuan Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with SABRINA M AHRENS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2023 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Type 3 |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
May 20, 2024 | Hearing |
DEPT 14 - JUDGE AHRENS (Rm. 2-B ) - None Confirmed |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING | |
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTE FOR COMMISSIONERS FAMILY SUPPORT CALENDAR | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - UNCLAIMED | |
April 05, 2024 | Hearing |
C3 - PARENTAGE/CONTEMPT (Rm. 407 ) - 1:30 Motion - Child Support Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
|
April 05, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | STATE'S MEMORANDUM FOR MANDATORY REVIEW HEARING | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING ORIGINAL CASE SCHEDULE | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.