Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Edwards, Erika Nicole, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with Alicia Marie Burton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2023 |
CategoryParenting Plan\Child Support |
Last RefreshedJanuary 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
January 16, 2024 | Hearing |
C3 - SHOW CAUSE/FAMILY LAW (Rm. 407 ) - 9:00 Motion - Temporary Order Assignment to Set Trial Date Confirmed |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | RESPONSE | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | HEARING INFORMATION FORM | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | PROOF OF MAILING | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | SEALED FINANCIAL SOURCE DOCUMENT | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | SEALED PERSONAL HEALTH CARE RECORDS | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ERIKA EDWARDS SUPPLEMENTAL | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | HEARING INFORMATION FORM | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.