Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Prince, Misty R, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Zwiefelhofer, Noah R, in the jurisdiction of Chippewa County, WI, . Chippewa County, WI Superior Courts with Cameron, Roderick A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2016 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChippewa County, WI |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary order
Judge: Cameron, Roderick A. |
|
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Received documents | |
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Prop. temporary order
Judge: Cameron, Roderick A. |
|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary order
Judge: Cameron, Roderick A. |
|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Prop. temporary order
Judge: Cameron, Roderick A. |
|
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Electronic Notice Update | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | eFiled Document Fee Paid | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of retainer | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Cameron, Roderick A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.