Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company vs Wick, Jerrika K. et al
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Eau Claire County, WI. Judge Gabler, William M presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 11, 2013
Last Refreshed
September 29, 2022
Filing Location
Eau Claire County, WI
Judge
Hon. Gabler, William M
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Full satisfaction | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of judgment fee paid | |
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Driver license revocation - civil judgment | |
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Amended judgment
Judge: Gabler, William M |
|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Gabler, William M |
|
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Prop. Order Denied
Judge: Gabler, William M |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Other papers | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Prop. order for judgment
Judge: Gabler, William M |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of motion, motion | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Notes | |
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order for judgment
Judge: Gabler, William M |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Prop. order for judgment
Judge: Gabler, William M |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Prop. Order Denied | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Bill of costs | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Stipulation/order of dismissal
Judge: Gabler, William M |
|
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Dismissed
Judge: Gabler, William M |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Other papers | |
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Received documents | |
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of service | |
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons and complaint | |
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Case initiated by electronic filing | |
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Records scanned | |
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid |