Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Brocker, Chelsea Belinda filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Mckinnis, Mercedes Maria, in the jurisdiction of Fond Du Lac County, WI, . Fond Du Lac County, WI Superior Courts with Wirtz, Robert J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 10, 2020 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFond Du Lac County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition granted
Judge: Danner, Comm. Sally Anne |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for support
Judge: Danner, Comm. Sally Anne |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Received documents | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Interim financial summary to child supt agency | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of nonmilitary service | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Confidential petition addendum | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons and petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.