Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
State of Wisconsin vs. Gregory Lee Larson
On July 05, 2022 a traffic forfeiture case was filed in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, WI. Judge Becker, Anna presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 05, 2022
Last Refreshed
November 29, 2023
Filing Location
Jackson County, WI
Judge
Category
Traffic Forfeiture
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
General Criminal
Status
Closed
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dispositional order/judgment
Judge: Becker, Anna |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Becker, Anna |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Charge amended | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial conference
Judge: Jensen, Crystal |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of hearing | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury fee paid | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Not guilty plea - written | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | eFiled Document Fee Paid | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Not guilty plea
Judge: Becker, Anna |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury demand | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Demand for Discovery - Defendant | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of retainer | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation filed | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Case initiated by electronic filing |