Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Shawano, County of vs. Dallas C Rockman
On March 21, 2019 a non-traffic ordinance violation case was filed in the jurisdiction of Shawano County, WI.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 21, 2019
Last Refreshed
September 09, 2022
Filing Location
Shawano County, WI
Category
Non-Traffic Ordinance Violation
Status
Closed
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Change of address notification for Rockman, Dallas C | |
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment application agreement | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Received documents | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment
Judge: Kussel, William F., Jr. |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Intake
Judge: Kussel, William F., Jr. |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dispositional order/judgment
Judge: Kussel, William F., Jr. |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Non appearance
Judge: Kussel, William F., Jr. |
|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation filed | |
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Case initiated by electronic filing |