Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Leprino Foods Co, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Margaret Reidy Pflueger, against Pumping Solutions Inc, represented by Douglas W Poling, Leviy P Johnson, Stephanie Anne Reedy, in the jurisdiction of Denver County, CO, . Denver County, CO Superior Courts with J Eric Elliff presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Warranty |
Last RefreshedJune 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDenver County, CO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Reply
Date: August 16, 2019Motion in Limine(Related Document)
Date: January 27, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: March 27, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: January 17, 2020Order
Date: September 27, 2019Order(Related Document)
Date: November 12, 2019Notice
Date: February 25, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: November 11, 2019Motion
Date: November 11, 2019Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: February 12, 2020Order
Date: August 26, 2019Response(Related Document)
Date: February 10, 2020Motion
Date: February 12, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: July 31, 2019Notice
Date: September 25, 2019Order(Related Document)
Date: February 13, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: January 16, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: September 05, 2019Order
Date: February 26, 2020Order
Date: November 06, 2019Proposed Order
Date: January 16, 2020Stipulation
Date: March 26, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: July 31, 2019Proposed Order
Date: July 31, 2019Motion(Related Document)
Date: August 16, 2019Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: March 26, 2020Entry of Appearance
Date: August 12, 2019Response(Related Document)
Date: August 09, 2019Order(Related Document)
Date: August 02, 2019Motion(Related Document)
Date: July 31, 2019Motion
Date: July 30, 2019Proposed Order
Date: July 12, 2019Motion(Related Document)
Date: July 30, 2019Notice
Date: August 02, 2019Order(Related Document)
Date: May 22, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 03, 2019Return of Service
Date: June 13, 2019Return of Service
Date: June 13, 2019Proposed Order
Date: July 30, 2019Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: July 30, 2019Entry of Appearance
Date: July 12, 2019Order(Related Document)
Date: July 30, 2019Report
Date: November 07, 2019Complaint - 3rd Party
Date: June 03, 2019Motion to Dismiss(Related Document)
Date: July 12, 2019Response(Related Document)
Date: August 28, 2019Motion(Related Document)
Date: May 21, 2019Summons
Date: June 03, 2019Summons
Date: June 03, 2019Proposed Order
Date: May 21, 2019Filing Other(Related Document)
Date: March 27, 2019Order(Related Document)
Date: March 28, 2019Filing Other(Related Document)
Date: May 02, 2019Order
Date: January 02, 2019Proposed Order - Case Management(Related Document)
Date: March 26, 2019Return of Service
Date: January 24, 2019Notice
Date: March 06, 2019Answer w/Jury Demand
Date: February 20, 2019Motion(Related Document)
Date: July 26, 2019Order
Date: January 02, 2019Notice
Date: March 05, 2019Complaint w/Jury Demand
Date: December 27, 2018Motion(Related Document)
Date: March 04, 2019Order(Related Document)
Date: March 06, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 27, 2018Summons
Date: December 27, 2018Notice
Date: February 25, 2019Entry of Appearance
Date: July 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:(Proposed) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (also filed on behalf of Plaintiff Leprino Foods Company and 3rd Party Defendant Paul Mueller Company) |
|
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice (also filed on behalf of Plaintiff Leprino Foods Company and 3rd Party Defendant Paul Mueller Company) | |
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) (Proposed) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (also filed on behalf of Plaintiff Leprino Foods Company and 3rd Party Defendant Paul Mueller Company) |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
JTRL Dispo - Trial Not Held N/A |
|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Order noting settlement and giving parties additional time to file settlement paperwork | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Closed N/A |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement (also filed on behalf of Leprino Foods Co) | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Proposed Order Regarding Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Trial Management Order |
|
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order Regarding Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Trial Management Order |
|
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Trial Management Order (also filed on behalf of Pumping Solutions Inc) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.