Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Egon Feldman, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Brian David Pushchak, against Brien Darby, Carol Rothrock, Nolan Stover, represented by Thomas Eugene Hames, William Hondlow Short, in the jurisdiction of Denver County, CO, . Denver County, CO Superior Courts with Ross B Buchanan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedJune 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDenver County, CO |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Notice
Date: July 18, 2019Answer w/Jury Demand
Date: June 20, 2019Return of Service
Date: June 05, 2019Summons
Date: May 28, 2019Proposed Order
Date: July 12, 2019Return of Service
Date: June 05, 2019Order
Date: May 28, 2019Summons
Date: May 28, 2019Proposed Order - Case Management
Date: August 18, 2019Complaint - Amended(Related Document)
Date: May 30, 2019Order
Date: July 16, 2019Complaint w/Jury Demand
Date: May 28, 2019Summons
Date: May 28, 2019Answer w/Jury Demand(Related Document)
Date: July 30, 2019Order(Related Document)
Date: January 06, 2020Notice(Related Document)
Date: January 07, 2020Response(Related Document)
Date: December 17, 2019Response(Related Document)
Date: December 16, 2019Exhibit List
Date: December 19, 2019Reply(Related Document)
Date: January 03, 2020Order
Date: February 11, 2020Response(Related Document)
Date: December 16, 2019Motion(Related Document)
Date: December 30, 2019Reply(Related Document)
Date: January 03, 2020Proposed Order
Date: December 17, 2019Proposed Order
Date: December 17, 2019Proposed Order
Date: December 17, 2019Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: February 13, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: February 13, 2020Disclosure Certificate
Date: December 17, 2019Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: December 30, 2019Order(Related Document)
Date: December 31, 2019Reply(Related Document)
Date: January 03, 2020Stipulation
Date: February 13, 2020Motion
Date: December 17, 2019Reply(Related Document)
Date: January 03, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment(Related Document)
Date: November 25, 2019Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: November 25, 2019Order(Related Document)
Date: November 25, 2019Reply(Related Document)
Date: July 19, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment(Related Document)
Date: November 25, 2019Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: November 25, 2019Motion(Related Document)
Date: October 01, 2019Response(Related Document)
Date: December 16, 2019Order(Related Document)
Date: November 25, 2019Motion(Related Document)
Date: November 18, 2019Response
Date: November 18, 2019Notice(Related Document)
Date: November 22, 2019Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: November 18, 2019Order(Related Document)
Date: October 04, 2019Motion(Related Document)
Date: November 08, 2019Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: November 08, 2019Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: October 01, 2019Filing Other
Date: November 18, 2019Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: July 19, 2019Notice
Date: August 15, 2019Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: November 18, 2019Disclosure Certificate
Date: August 22, 2019Substitution of Counsel
Date: October 24, 2019Order
Date: August 23, 2019Notice
Date: August 27, 2019Order(Related Document)
Date: September 20, 2019Response(Related Document)
Date: July 12, 2019Return of Service
Date: July 11, 2019Motion to Dismiss(Related Document)
Date: June 28, 2019Proposed Order
Date: June 28, 2019Notice
Date: July 22, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 28, 2019Filing Other
Date: July 11, 2019Proposed Order - Case Management(Related Document)
Date: September 11, 2019Filing Other
Date: June 05, 2019Return of Service
Date: June 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
JTRL Dispo - Trial Not Held N/A |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Dismissed with Prejudice N/A |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Closed - Dismissed N/A |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE- So Ordered |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal (filed on behalf of all parties) | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SET IN-PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice(Related Document) Defendant Rothrock's Combined Status Report, Notice of Tentative Settlement and Response to Order |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) ORDER TO SET STATUS CONFERENCE |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit A to Defendant Rothrock's Reply to Darby/Stover Defendants' Response to Her Motion for Summary Judgment - No Duty - August 9, 2019 email and conferral letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.