Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Mazza, Tim et al v. Air Academy Fed Credit Union et al
A Breach Of Contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Denver County, CO. Judge Martin Egelhoff presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 01, 2020
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Denver County, CO
Category
Breach of Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Dismissal
Overview
This action concerns RRCU’s practice of failing to refund unearned Guaranteed
Automobile Protection (“GAP”) fees to Colorado customers when the customer’s auto loan is
paid off early – i.e., prepaid prior to the original maturity date of the customer’s finance
agreement (an “early payoff”). RRCU, as the creditor on the finance agreement, has an
obligation to refund unearned GAP fees to its customers upon an early payoff of a finance
agreement. See 4 Colo. Code Regs. § 902-1:8 (h). Plaintiff brings claims on his individual behalf
for violations of the Colorado Consumer Protection Act (“CCPA”). Claimant also separately
brings a claim for breach of contract on behalf of himself, individually, and all others similarly
situated (the “Class”).
Plaintiff and the Class Members paid off their auto loans early, but RRCU (their
creditor) failed to refund the unearned GAP fees. Accordingly, RRCU has breached its contracts
with Plaintiff and the Class Members and violated Colorado law.
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order(Related Document)
Date: Jul 05, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Jul 05, 2023Filing Other
Date: Jun 30, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Jun 30, 2023Motion(Related Document)
Date: Jun 30, 2023Filing Other
Date: Jun 30, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: May 30, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: May 30, 2023Filing Other
Date: May 26, 2023Motion(Related Document)
Date: May 26, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: May 26, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Apr 26, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Apr 26, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Apr 24, 2023Motion(Related Document)
Date: Apr 24, 2023Affidavit
Date: Apr 12, 2023Affidavit
Date: Apr 12, 2023Affidavit
Date: Apr 12, 2023Motion
Date: Apr 12, 2023Affidavit
Date: Apr 12, 2023Proposed Order
Date: Apr 12, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Apr 05, 2023Proposed Order
Date: Apr 04, 2023Motion(Related Document)
Date: Apr 04, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 27, 2023Notice(Related Document)
Date: Mar 24, 2023Notice of Withdrawal
Date: Mar 14, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 08, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 08, 2022Filing Other
Date: Aug 25, 2022Filing Other
Date: Aug 25, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Aug 25, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Aug 25, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Jul 22, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Jul 22, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Jun 08, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Jun 06, 2022Affidavit
Date: Jun 06, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Jun 06, 2022Affidavit
Date: Jun 06, 2022Affidavit
Date: Jun 06, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Jun 06, 2022Affidavit
Date: Jun 06, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Jun 03, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Jun 03, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Apr 07, 2022Notice(Related Document)
Date: Apr 05, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 28, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Mar 25, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Mar 25, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 23, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Mar 22, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Mar 22, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 22, 2022Stipulation(Related Document)
Date: Mar 21, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 15, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Mar 14, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Mar 14, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 01, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Feb 28, 2022Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 28, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 11, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Feb 10, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Feb 10, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 01, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 28, 2022Stipulation(Related Document)
Date: Jan 27, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 26, 2022Stipulation(Related Document)
Date: Jan 25, 2022Response
Date: Jan 24, 2022Notice
Date: Jan 11, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 10, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 10, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Jan 07, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Jan 07, 2022Report(Related Document)
Date: Jan 07, 2022Notice
Date: Jan 05, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 04, 2022Response(Related Document)
Date: Jan 04, 2022Complaint - Amended
Date: Jan 03, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Jan 03, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Jan 03, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Dec 31, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Dec 31, 2021Complaint - Amended
Date: Dec 15, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Dec 15, 2021Motion
Date: Dec 15, 2021Entry of Appearance
Date: Dec 03, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Nov 15, 2021Notice of Electronic Record Certified to COA or SC
Date: Nov 15, 2021Filing Other
Date: Nov 10, 2021Certificate
Date: Oct 18, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 18, 2021Motion
Date: Oct 18, 2021Affidavit
Date: Oct 18, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 15, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 15, 2021Answer - Amended(Related Document)
Date: Oct 15, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 15, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 15, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 15, 2021Response
Date: Oct 14, 2021Proposed Order - Case Management(Related Document)
Date: Oct 08, 2021Answer w/Jury Demand
Date: Oct 07, 2021Reply
Date: Oct 04, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Oct 01, 2021Reply
Date: Oct 01, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Sep 30, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Sep 30, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 30, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Sep 30, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Sep 30, 2021Filing Other
Date: Sep 28, 2021Response
Date: Sep 27, 2021Designation of Record on Appeal
Date: Sep 22, 2021Notice
Date: Sep 21, 2021Letter
Date: Sep 17, 2021Advisory Notice - NAPF
Date: Sep 17, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Sep 15, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Sep 15, 2021Notice of Appeal
Date: Sep 15, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Sep 13, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Sep 13, 2021Answer - Amended
Date: Sep 13, 2021Filing Other
Date: Sep 09, 2021Filing Other
Date: Sep 09, 2021Filing Other
Date: Sep 09, 2021Entry of Appearance
Date: Sep 07, 2021Notice
Date: Sep 07, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Aug 23, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Aug 17, 2021Reply(Related Document)
Date: Aug 11, 2021Report(Related Document)
Date: Aug 06, 2021Response - Motion to Dismiss(Related Document)
Date: Aug 04, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Aug 02, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Aug 02, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Aug 02, 2021Filing Other
Date: Jul 27, 2021Reply
Date: Jul 27, 2021Entry of Appearance
Date: Jul 26, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Jul 20, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Jul 19, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Jul 19, 2021Order
Date: Jul 17, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Jul 14, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Jul 14, 2021Notice
Date: Jul 14, 2021Response
Date: Jul 13, 2021Notice
Date: Jul 08, 2021Report
Date: Jul 07, 2021Reply
Date: Jul 02, 2021Filing Other
Date: Jun 29, 2021Response
Date: Jun 25, 2021Order
Date: Jun 25, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Jun 22, 2021Filing Other
Date: Jun 22, 2021Filing Other
Date: Jun 22, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Jun 22, 2021Reply
Date: Jun 15, 2021Response - Motion to Dismiss
Date: Jun 08, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Jun 04, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Jun 04, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: May 26, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: May 26, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: May 21, 2021Filing Other
Date: May 21, 2021Proposed Order
Date: May 20, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: May 20, 2021Motion to Dismiss(Related Document)
Date: May 04, 2021Proposed Order
Date: May 04, 2021Answer
Date: May 04, 2021Affidavit
Date: May 03, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: May 03, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Apr 20, 2021Reply(Related Document)
Date: Apr 16, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Apr 13, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Apr 12, 2021Motion
Date: Apr 12, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Apr 08, 2021Response - Motion to Dismiss
Date: Apr 05, 2021Filing Other
Date: Apr 05, 2021Motion to Dismiss(Related Document)
Date: Mar 15, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Mar 15, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 12, 2021Filing Other(Related Document)
Date: Mar 03, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 01, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 01, 2021Affidavit
Date: Feb 24, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 24, 2021Certificate
Date: Feb 24, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Feb 24, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 24, 2021Certificate
Date: Jan 22, 2021Affidavit
Date: Jan 22, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Jan 22, 2021Motion
Date: Jan 22, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 05, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 05, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 05, 2021Filing Other(Related Document)
Date: Jan 04, 2021Reply(Related Document)
Date: Dec 31, 2020Reply
Date: Dec 31, 2020Notice
Date: Dec 30, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Dec 28, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Dec 28, 2020Response - Motion to Dismiss(Related Document)
Date: Dec 24, 2020Response - Motion to Dismiss
Date: Dec 24, 2020Notice(Related Document)
Date: Dec 18, 2020Notice(Related Document)
Date: Dec 18, 2020Affidavit(Related Document)
Date: Dec 16, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Dec 16, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Dec 09, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Dec 08, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Dec 08, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Motion to Dismiss(Related Document)
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Filing Other
Date: Dec 03, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Motion to Dismiss(Related Document)
Date: Dec 03, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Motion to Dismiss(Related Document)
Date: Dec 03, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Dec 03, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Dec 03, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Dec 03, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Dec 03, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Dec 03, 2020Notice
Date: Dec 03, 2020Return of Service
Date: Dec 03, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Dec 02, 2020Motion
Date: Dec 02, 2020Notice
Date: Nov 13, 2020Notice
Date: Oct 29, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 22, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 16, 2020Motion
Date: Oct 15, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 15, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 12, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 12, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 12, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Oct 08, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 08, 2020Notice
Date: Oct 08, 2020Notice
Date: Oct 08, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Oct 08, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 08, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 08, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Oct 08, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 02, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 02, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 02, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Oct 01, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 01, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 01, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Oct 01, 2020Notice
Date: Sep 30, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 30, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Sep 30, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 30, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Sep 28, 2020Request(Related Document)
Date: Sep 28, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 28, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 26, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 25, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 25, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Sep 25, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 24, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Sep 24, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 23, 2020Motion
Date: Sep 23, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Sep 17, 2020Motion to Dismiss(Related Document)
Date: Sep 17, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Sep 17, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Sep 17, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Sep 17, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Sep 17, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 14, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 14, 2020Entry of Appearance
Date: Sep 11, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Sep 10, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Sep 10, 2020Entry of Appearance
Date: Sep 10, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 10, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Sep 10, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Sep 10, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Sep 10, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Sep 10, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: Sep 10, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Sep 10, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Sep 10, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Sep 10, 2020Filing Other
Date: Sep 10, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 10, 2020Entry of Appearance
Date: Sep 09, 2020Motion
Date: Sep 09, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 09, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Sep 09, 2020Entry of Appearance
Date: Sep 09, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 09, 2020Entry of Appearance
Date: Sep 09, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 09, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 09, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 09, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 08, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Sep 04, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Sep 04, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Sep 04, 2020Entry of Appearance
Date: Sep 04, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Sep 04, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Sep 04, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Sep 04, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Sep 04, 2020Answer w/Jury Demand
Date: Sep 04, 2020Entry of Appearance(Related Document)
Date: Sep 03, 2020Notice(Related Document)
Date: Sep 02, 2020Entry of Appearance
Date: Sep 01, 2020Return of Service
Date: Aug 28, 2020Return of Service
Date: Aug 28, 2020Return of Service
Date: Aug 28, 2020Return of Service
Date: Aug 28, 2020Return of Service
Date: Aug 28, 2020Return of Service
Date: Aug 28, 2020Return of Service
Date: Aug 28, 2020Return of Service
Date: Aug 27, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Aug 20, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Aug 20, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Aug 14, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Aug 14, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Aug 14, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Aug 14, 2020Entry of Appearance
Date: Aug 14, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Aug 14, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: Aug 12, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Aug 12, 2020Return of Service
Date: Jul 31, 2020Return of Service
Date: Jul 31, 2020Return of Service
Date: Jul 31, 2020Notice
Date: Jul 16, 2020Order
Date: Jul 10, 2020Motion
Date: Jul 09, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Jul 09, 2020Order
Date: Jul 07, 2020Order
Date: Jul 07, 2020Order
Date: Jul 07, 2020Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: Jul 01, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: Jul 01, 2020Summons
Date: Jul 01, 2020Complaint w/Jury Demand
Date: Jul 01, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Order Approving of Settlement Agreement Between Plaintiff and Defendant Air Academy Federal Credit Union |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof w/attached |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Closed - Post Judgment N/A |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Declaration of Christopher Longley Re: Notice Plan and Cost of Administration |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order Approving of Settlement Agreement Between Plaintiff and Defendant Air Academy Federal Credit Union |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof w/attached |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Declaration of Jason M. Frank in Support of Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 to Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Order Approving Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Unopposed Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award, and Memorandum of Law in Support- Granted |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Declaration of Franklin D. Azar in Support of Unopposed Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award (with Exhibits 1-3) |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award, and Memorandum of Law in Support |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order Approving Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Amended Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof w/attach |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Order Preliminarily Approving of Settlement Agreement Between Plaintiff and Defendant Air Academy Federal Credit Union, and Approving Notice to the Members of the Settlement Class |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving of Settlement Agreement Between Plaintiff and Defendant Air Academy Federal Credit Union, and Approving Notice to the Members of the Settlement Class |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Amended Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof w/attach |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 to Amended Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Settlement Agreement) |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reopen - Post Judgment N/A |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration of Christopher Longley on Settlement Administration Qualifications and Adequacy of Notice Plan |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration of Tim Mazza in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement and Notice to Class |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration of Jason M. Frank in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof w/attach |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration of Franklin D. Azar in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving of Settlement Agreement Between Plaintiff and Defendant Air Academy Federal Credit Union, and Approving Notice to the Members of the Settlement Class | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 to Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Settlement Agreement) |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation for Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof- Granted |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitations | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation for Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Joint Notice of Class Action Settlement w/attach (Also filed on behalf of Defendant) |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice(Related Document) Joint Notice of Class Action Settlement w/attach (Also filed on behalf of Defendant) |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 to Joint Notice of Class Action Settlement (Order Transferring Back to District Court) |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) ORDER APPROVING OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT RED ROCKS CREDIT UNION |
|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) ORDER APPROVING ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARD |
|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Closed N/A |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Atticus Administration Declaration in Support of Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Agreement (w/attach to doc) |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Declaration of Jason Frank in Support of Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Agreement |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Agreement and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof (w/attach to doc) |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Approving of Settlement Agreement Between Plaintiff and Defendant Red Rocks Credit Union |
|
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award, and Memorandum of Law in Support |
|
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Propose Order Approving Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Preliminarily Approving of Settlement Agreement between Plaintiff Rael and Defendant Red Rocks Credit Union, and Approving Notice to the Members of the Settlement Class |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation for Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Atticus Administration Declaration of Notice Plan and Cost of Administration (with attach to doc) |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving of Settlement Agreement Between Plaintiff and Defendant Red Rocks Credit Union, and Approving Notice to the Members of the Settlement Class | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration of Franklin D. Azar in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (with attach to doc) |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration of Saba Rael in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement and Notice to Class |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof (with attach to doc) |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration of Jason M. Frank in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (with attach to doc) |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation for Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation for Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Joint Notice of Class Action Settlement |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice(Related Document) Joint Notice of Class Action Settlement (also filed on behalf of Plaintiffs) |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Order |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Order (also filed on behalf of DEF) |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Order | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Red Rock's Credit Union's Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Red Rock's Credit Union's Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order re: Red Rock's Credit Union's Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Approving Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendant Credit Union of Denver as to the Lawsuit and Arbitration |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation(Related Document) Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendant Credit Union of Denver as to the Lawsuit and Arbitration (also filed on behalf of PTF) |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Red Rocks Credit Union's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Red Rocks Credit Union's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order re Red Rocks Credit Union's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Red Rock's Credit Union's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Red Rock's Credit Union's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order re Red Rock's Credit Union's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Order |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Order | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Order (also filed on behalf of def RRCU) |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Approving Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation(Related Document) Stipulation of Dismissal (also filed on behalf of DEF) |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Approving Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation(Related Document) Stipulation of Dismissal (also filed on behalf of DEF) |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response Red Rocks Credit Union's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:January 7, 2022 Status Report |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Plaintiff's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Amend Complaint |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Plaintiff's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Amend Complaint |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Plaintiff's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Amend Complaint |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report(Related Document) January 7, 2022 Status Report |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Plaintiff's Notice of Errata Re: Exhibit 1 to Motion to Amend Complaint (with attach) |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Amended Complaint and Jury Demand (Filed as Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Notice of Errata Re: Exhibit 1 to Motion to Amend Complaint) |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Amend Case Management Order |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response(Related Document) Defendant Prestige Financial Services, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff Jason Hendricks' Motion to Amend Pleadings (with attach) |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit 6 to Defendant Prestige Financial Services, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff Jason Hendricks' Motion to Amend Pleadings (Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures) |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit 5 to Defendant Prestige Financial Services, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff Jason Hendricks' Motion to Amend Pleadings (Check - PRESTIGE000023) |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit 1 to Defendant Prestige Financial Services, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff Jason Hendricks' Motion to Amend Pleadings (GAP Agreement) |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit 2 to Defendant Prestige Financial Services, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff Jason Hendricks' Motion to Amend Pleadings (RISC) |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit 3 to Defendant Prestige Financial Services, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff Jason Hendricks' Motion to Amend Pleadings (Plaintiff's Objections and Amended Responses to First Set of Interrogatories) |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit 4 to Defendant Prestige Financial Services, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff Jason Hendricks' Motion to Amend Pleadings (Email dated 12-17-2021) |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Complaint - Amended Amended Complaint and Jury Demand (filed as Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint) (with attach to doc) |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint (with attach) |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint | |
December 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Amend Case Management Order | |
December 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion to Amend Case Management Order |
|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint - Amended Amended Complaint and Jury Demand (Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint) |
|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint (with attach) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance of Paul R. Janda | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Out of State Counsel's Verified Motion Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Electronic Record Certified to COA or SC NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COLORADO COURT OF APPEALS (21CA1421) |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Other FROM ATTY REGISTRATION OFFICE RE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE BY ATTY SCOTT H SIMMS 21PHV6796 |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order Granting Out of State Counsel's Verified Motion Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Out of State Counsel's Verified Motion Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Scott H. Sims | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Denying Motion to Amend Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Defendant Ent Credit Union's Motion to Modify Order Consolidating Proceedings |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer - Amended(Related Document) Defendant Red Rocks Credit Union's First Amended Answer and Jury Demand w/attach |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit A to Defendant Red Rocks Credit Union's First Amended Answer and Jury Demand |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Defendant Ent Credit Union's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Jury Demand |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Case Management |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Modify Order Consolidating Proceedings |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Case Management(Related Document) Proposed Case Management Order (also filed on behalf of Prestige Financial Inc, ENT Credit Union, and Red Rocks Credit Union) |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer w/Jury Demand Answer to Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply RED ROCKS CREDIT UNIONS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order re Defendant Ent Credit Union's Motion to Modify Order Consolidating Proceedings | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply Defendant Ent Credit Union's Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendant Ent Credit Union's Motion to Modify Order Consolidating Proceedings |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendant Prestige Financial Services, Inc.'s Motion to Clarify or Modify Consolidation Order by Requesting Separate Trial |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) (Proposed) Order Granting Defendant Prestige Financial Services, Inc.'s Motion to Clarify or Modify Consolidation Order by Requesting Separate Trial |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Re Motion to Amend Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Motion to Amend Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Plaintiff Cecilia Macasero's Opposition to Defendant Ent Credit Union's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response Plaintiff Saba Rael's Response to Defendant Red Rocks Credit Union's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Jury Demand |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Designation of Record on Appeal Copy of Designation of Record on Appeal (Filed on behalf of Court of Appeals) |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Scheduling Notice |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Appeal Requirement Letter |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Advisory Notice - NAPF Copy of Advisement of Filing Notice of Appeal from the Colorado Court of Appeals 21CA1421 Record on Appeal is due 11/17/21 |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order re Defendant Ent Credit Union's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendant Ent Credit Union's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal w/attach | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit - A to Notice of Appeal |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Jury Demand (w/attach) |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order re Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Jury Demand | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer - Amended Defendant Red Rocks Credit Unions First Amended Answer and Jury Demand (filed as Exhibit B to Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Jury Demand) |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A to Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Jury Demand |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Attachment 1 to Plaintiffs' Proposed Stipulated Schedule |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Plaintiffs' Proposed Stipulated Schedule |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Defendants' Proposed Briefing Schedule (also filed on behalf of Defendants Prestige Financial Services, Inc. and Ent Credit Union) |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance of J. Randolph Earnest | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Status Conference | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Regarding Defendant Credit Union of Denver's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Regarding Plaintiff Jason Hendricks' and Defendant Prestige Financial Services Inc.'s Status Report (also filed on behalf of Plaintiff Jason Hendricks) |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply(Related Document) Defendant Credit Union of Denver's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration w/attach |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A to Defendant Credit Union of Denver's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit B to Defendant Credit Union of Denver's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report(Related Document) Plaintiff Jason Hendricks' and Defendant Prestige Financial Services Inc.'s Status Report (also filed on behalf of Plaintiff Jason Hendricks) |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response - Motion to Dismiss(Related Document) Plaintiff Paula Stanley's Opposition to Defendant Credit Union of Denver's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Plaintiff Cecilia Macasero's Motion to Strike Supplemental Declaration and Exhibits Thereto, or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Surreply- Denied |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Denying Defendant Ent Credit Union's CRCP 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Individual Arbitration |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Denying Plaintiff Mazza's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's May 21, 2021, Order |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Arbitration Status and Status of Claims |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply Plaintiff Cecilia Macasero's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Supplemental Declaration and Exhibits Thereto, or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Sur-Reply |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Plaintiff Cecilia Macasero's Motion to Strike Supplemental Declaration and Exhibits Thereto, or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Sur-Reply |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Plaintiff Cecilia Macasero's Motion to Strike Supplemental Declaration and Exhibits Thereto, or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Sur-Reply |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Plaintiff Cecilia Macasero's Motion to Strike Supplemental Declaration and Exhibits Thereto, or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Sur-Reply | |
July 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Regarding July 30, 2021 Status Conference | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendant Credit Union of Denver's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration w/ Attach |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order re Defendant Credit Union of Denver's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A Attachment to Defendant Credit Union of Denver's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice DEFENDANT CREDIT UNION OF DENVERS NOTICE REGARDING ORDER TO STAY ACTIO |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response Defendant Ent Credit Union's Opposition to Plaintiff's Ceclilia Macasero's Motion to Strike Supplemental Declaration and Exhibits Thereto, or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Sur-Reply |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Setting Status Conference | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report First Status Report |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply Plaintiff Mazza's Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's May 21, 2021, Order |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Plaintiff Paula Stanley and Defendant Credit Union of Denver's Status Report |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Plaintiff Mazza's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's May 21, 2021 Order w/ attach | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Ex. 1 to Response to Plaintiff Mazza's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's May 21, 2021 Order |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Set Status Conference | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Cecilia Macasero's Motion to Strike Supplemental Declaration and Exhibits Thereto, or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Surreply | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Declaration of Michael D. Murphy in Support of Plaintiff Cecilia Macasero's Motion to Strike Supplemental Declaration and Exhibits Thereto, or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Surreply |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Supplemental Declaration of Cecilia Macasero in Support of Motion to Strike Supplemental Declaration and Exhibits Thereto, or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Surreply |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Plaintiff Cecilia Macasero's Motion to Strike Supplemental Declaration and Exhibits Thereto, or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Surreply |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply Defendant Ent Credit Union's Reply in Support of its C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Individual Arbitration w/. attach |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Supplemental Declaration of Mike Salamena in Support of Defendant Ent Credit Union's Reply in Support of C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration with Exhibits E- F |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response - Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Cecilia Macasero's Opposition to Defendant Ent Credit Union's C.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Individual Arbitration w/ attach |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff Cecilia Macasero's Opposition to Defendant Ent Credit Union's C.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Individual Arbitration |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Plaintiff Mazza's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's May 21, 2021, Order w/ attach |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Mazza's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's May 21, 2021, Order | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff Mazza's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's May 21, 2021, Order |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Out of State Counsel's Verified Motion Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Ent Credit Union's C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:DEFENDANT AIR ACADEMY FEDERAL CREDIT UNIONS C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Other FROM ATTY REGISTRATION OFFICE RE: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE BY ATTY TAMI K. SIMS 21PHV6579 |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Ent Credit Union's C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Ent Credit Union's C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss(Related Document) DEFENDANT ENT CREDIT UNION'S C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION w/ Attach |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting DEFENDANT ENT CREDIT UNION'S C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Declaration and Exhibit D Attachment to DEFENDANT ENT CREDIT UNION'S C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Declaration and Exhibits A, B and C Attachment to DEFENDANT ENT CREDIT UNION'S C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Defendant Ent Credit Union's Answer to Plaintiff Cecilia Macasero's Complaint and Jury Demand (Jury not Demanded) |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Tami K. Sims in Support of Verified Motion Requesting Permission to Appear Pro Hac Vice | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Out of State Counsel's Verified Motion Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order DENYING Defendant Ent Credit Union's C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Individual Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply(Related Document) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AIR ACADEMY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION'S C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting: UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT AIR ACADEMY FEDERAL CREDIT UNIONS C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) (PROPOSED) ORDER RE: UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT AIR ACADEMY FEDERAL CREDIT UNIONS C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT AIR ACADEMY FEDERAL CREDIT UNIONS C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay Litigation (Hendricks v. Prestige Financial Services, Inc.) to Allow the Parties to Engage in Early Mediation of Plaintiffs Class Action Claims (Also filed on behalf of Plaintiff, Jason Hendricks) |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response - Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Mazza's Opposition to Defendant Air Academy Federal Credit Union's C.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Stay |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Declaration of Jason M. Frank in Support of Plaintiff Mazza's Opposition to Defendant Air Academy Federal Credit Union's C.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Stay |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss(Related Document) DEFENDANT AIR ACADEMY FEDERAL CREDIT UNIONS C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER TO DEFENDANT AIR ACADEMY FEDERAL CREDIT UNIONS C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Out of State Counsel's Amended Motion Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Other(Related Document) FROM ATTY REGISTRATION OFFICE RE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE BY ATTY JASON M FRANK 07PHV1519 |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:DEFENDANT AIR ACADEMY FEDERAL CREDIT UNIONS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE C.R.C.P. 12(B)(5) |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay Litigation (Stanley v. Credit Union of Denver) to Allow the Parties to Engage in Early Mediation of Plaintiff's Class Action Claims |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Jason Frank | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order Granting Out of State Counsel's Amended Motion Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Out of State Counsel's Amended Motion Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Out of State Counsel's Verified Motion Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Jason M. Frank | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Out of State Counsel's Verified Motion Requesting Pro Hac Admission | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Out of State Counsel's Verified Motion Requesting Pro Hac Admission |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Defendant Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp.'s Unopposed Motion to Compel Arbitration Under C.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) and Staying Proceedings pending arbitration. |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration of Canvas CU |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by SECURITY SERVICE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Other(Related Document) FROM ATTY REGISTRATION OFFICE RE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE BY ATTY STUART M RICHTER 20PHV5791 |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reply(Related Document) Defendant ENT Credit Union's Reply Memorandum in Support of its C.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Individual Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings w/attach |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Attachment to Defendant ENT Credit Union's Reply Memorandum in Support of its C.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Individual Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings (Supplemental Declaration of Scott Gennerman) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reply DEFENDANT AIR ACADEMY FEDERAL CREDIT UNIONS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE C.R.C.P. 12(B)(5) |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order re Defendant Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp.'s Unopposed Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration Under C.R.C.P. 12(b)(1), or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendant Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp.'s Unopposed Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration Under C.R.C.P. 12(b)(1), or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings |
|
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response - Motion to Dismiss(Related Document) Plaintiff Macasero's Opposition to Defendant Ent Credit Union's C.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Individual Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings |
|
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response - Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Mazza's Opposition to Defendant Air Academy Federal Credit Union's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) or in the alternative C.R.C.P. 12(b)(5) |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice(Related Document) Notice re: Defendant Security Service Federal Credit Union's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration (Captioned for 20CV32236 but pertains to Motion to Dismiss filed 12/3 in this case) |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice(Related Document) Notice re: Defendant Canvas Credit Union's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit(Related Document) Affidavit of Stuart M. Richter in Support of Verified Motion Requesting Permission to Appear Pro Hac Vice |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Out of State Counsel's Verified Motion Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Defendant Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendant Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order Granting Defendant Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 4 to to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 6 to to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss(Related Document) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration w/attach |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 9 to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 8 to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 2 to to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration - Declaration of David C. Powell(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration - Declaration of Mark Wild(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order re: Defendant Security Service Federal Credit Union's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 5 to to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 3 to to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 7 to to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 3 to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 5 Part 1 to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 2 to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 4 to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Declaration of Chad Shane |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order re: Defendant Canvas Credit Union's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 5 Part 2 to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss(Related Document) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration w/attach |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER RE: DEFENDANT AIR ACADEMY FEDERAL CREDIT UNIONS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE C.R.C.P. 12(B)(5) | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc EX. 1 TO DEFENDANT AIR ACADEMY FEDERAL CREDIT UNIONS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE C.R.C.P. 12(B)(5)(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss(Related Document) DEFENDANT AIR ACADEMY FEDERAL CREDIT UNIONS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE C.R.C.P. 12(B)(5) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendant Ent Credit Union's C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Individual Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings w/attach |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order re Defendant Ent Credit Union's C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Individual Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit - A to Defendant Ent Credit Union's C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Compel Individual Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Joint Motion to Stay Litigation (Hendricks v. Prestige Financial Services, Inc.) to Allow the Parties to Engage in Early Mediation of Plaintiffs Class Action Claims (Also filed on behalf of Plaintiff, Jason Hendricks) |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) (Proposed) Order Re: Joint Motion to Stay Litigation (Hendricks v. Prestige Financial Services, Inc.) to Allow the Parties to Engage in Early Mediation of Plaintiffs Class Action Claims |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Consolidation | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service - Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Orders, Motion and Notice served to Patrick Mathis for OneMain Financial on 12/1/2020 |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) (Proposed) Order Joint Motion to Stay Litigation (Stanley v. Credit Union of Denver) to Allow the Parties to Engage in Early Mediation of Plaintiff's Class Action Claims |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Joint Motion to Stay Litigation (Stanley v. Credit Union of Denver) to Allow the Parties to Engage in Early Mediation of Plaintiff's Class Action Claims (Also filed on behalf of Plaintiff Paula Stanley) |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATION | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proceeding Case N/A |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Defendant Bellco Credit Union's C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) Motion To Dismiss And Compel Individual Arbitration, Or In The Alternative, To Stay (w/attach) |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order on Defendant Canvas Credit Union's Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendant Canvas Credit Union's Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order on Defendant Canvas Credit Union's Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs Pfeifer and Kettl to File Their Response to Defendant Bellcos Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) ORDER re: SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs Pfeifer and Kettl to File Their Response to Defendant Bellcos Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs Pfeifer and Kettl to File Their Response to Defendant Bellcos Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) PROPOSED ORDER re: SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF GILLET TO FILE HIS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT FMCCS MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order re Defendant Credit Union of Denver's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Motion |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order re Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff Gillet to File His Response to Defendant FMCC's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF GILLET TO FILE HIS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT FMCCS MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) (Proposed) Order re Defendant Credit Union of Denver's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Motion |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendant Credit Union of Denver's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Motion |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) (Proposed) Order re Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Defendant ENT Credit Union's Unopposed Third Request to Extend the Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ENT CREDIT UNIONS UNOPPOSED THIRD REQUEST TO EXTEND THE TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request(Related Document) Defendant ENT Credit Union's Unopposed Third Request to Extend the Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order on Defendant Canvas Credit Union's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
September 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Defendant Security Service Federal Credit Union's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand to December 3, 2020. |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) (Proposed) Order on Defendant Canvas Credit Union's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendant Canvas Credit Union's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Joint Motion for Second Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond To Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) (Proposed) Order Granting Joint Motion for Second Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond To Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Joint Motion for Second Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond To Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand (also filed on behalf of Plaintiffs Joel Mogensen and David Strine) |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Defendant Bellco Credit Union's C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) Motion To Dismiss And Compel Individual Arbitration, Or In The Alternative, To Stay | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss(Related Document) Defendant Bellco Credit Union's C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) Motion To Dismiss And Compel Individual Arbitration, Or In The Alternative, To Stay (w/attach) |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A-2 to Declaration of Juan Carlos Campos(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A-3 to Declaration of Juan Carlos Campos(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A to Defendant Bellco Credit Union's C.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) Motion To Dismiss And Compel Individual Arbitration, Or In The Alternative, To Stay - Declaration of Juan Carlos Campos (w/attach)(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A-1 to Declaration of Juan Carlos Campos(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order to UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Joint Motion For Extension Of Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Class Action Complaint And Jury Demand |
|
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance (Kevin S. Taylor) | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order to UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order re Defendant Credit Union of Denver's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Motion |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A - Part 1 - Colorado Vehicle Retail Installment Contract Attachment to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A - Part 3 - Colorado Vehicle Retail Installment Contract Attachment to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A - Part 4 - Colorado Vehicle Retail Installment Contract Attachment to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration w/ Attach | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A - Part 2 - Colorado Vehicle Retail Installment Contract Attachment to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion For Extension Of Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Class Action Complaint And Jury Demand | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Joint Motion For Extension Of Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Class Action Complaint And Jury Demand (Also filed on behalf Plaintiffs Joel Mogensen and David Strine) |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Filing Other FROM ATTY REGISTRATION OFFICE RE: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE BY ATTY ZACHARY L MCCAMEY 20PHV6260, DAVID C POWELL 08PHV1761, AND ALICIA A BAIARDO 20PHV6261 |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Proposed Order re Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance of Patrick M. Sweet | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendant Credit Union of Denver's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Motion |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) (Proposed) Order re Defendant Credit Union of Denver's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Motion |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance of Craig D. Joyce | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order re Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Granting Bellco Credit Union's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff Pfeifer's and Kettl's Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order re Defendant Ent Credit Union's Unopposed Second Request to Extend the Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:DEFENDANT CANVAS CREDIT UNIONS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order re: Canvas Credit Union's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff Burch's and Curtis's Class Action Complaint |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) DEFENDANT CANVAS CREDIT UNIONS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOREXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTIONCOMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Bellco Credit Union's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff Pfeifer's and Kettl's Class Action Complaint |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Bellco Credit Union's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff Pfeifer's and Kettl's Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance - Bradford J. Williams | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendant Ent Credit Union's Unopposed Second Request to Extend the Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order re Defendant Ent Credit Union's Unopposed Second Request to Extend the Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendant Security Service Federal Credit Union's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order RE: Defendant Security Service Federal Credit Union's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer w/Jury Demand Defendant Red Rocks Credit Union Answer and Jury Demand |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance(Related Document) Entry of Appearance of Jesse D. Rodgers |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice(Related Document) Notice of Withdrawal, Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service; Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Delay Reduction Orders; Order Re: Discovery Protocol, Pre-Trial Order. Motion for Consolidation, Order Granting Motion to Consolidate; Served on Robin Huttbanks on behalf of Chase Auto Finance Corp.; on 8/20/20 |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service; Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Delay Reduction Orders; Order Re: Discovery Protocol, Pre-Trial Order. Motion for Consolidation, Order Granting Motion to Consolidate; left on Intake Box on behalf of Santander Consumer USA, Inc. on 8/20/2020 |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service; Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Delay Reduction Orders; Order Re: Discovery Protocol, Pre-Trial Order. Motion for Consolidation, Order Granting Motion to Consolidate; Served on Martin Orena on behalf of Prestige Financial Services, Inc.; on 8/21/2020 |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service; Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Delay Reduction Orders; Order Re: Discovery Protocol, Pre-Trial Order. Motion for Consolidation, Order Granting Motion to Consolidate; Served on Sherri Hollils on behalf of Credit Union of Denver; on 8/20/2020 |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service; Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Delay Reduction Orders; Order Re: Discovery Protocol, Pre-Trial Order. Motion for Consolidation, Order Granting Motion to Consolidate; Left in intake box per company policy on behalf of Ford Motor Credit Co. LLC; on 8/20/2020 |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service; Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Delay Reduction Orders; Order Re: Discovery Protocol, Pre-Trial Order. Motion for Consolidation, Order Granting Motion to Consolidate; served to Shell Blanscet on behalf of Canvas Credit Union; on 8/20/2020 |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service; Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Delay Reduction Orders; Order Re: Discovery Protocol, Pre-Trial Order. Motion for Consolidation, Order Granting Motion to Consolidate; served to Michelle White on behalf of Bellco Credit Union; on 8/20/2020 |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service; Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, Civil Cover Sheet, Delay Reduction Orders Re: Discovery Protocol, Pre-trial Order and Motion for Consolidation, Oder Granting Motion for Consolidation; served on Glenn L. Strebe on behalf of Air Academy Federal Credit Union; on 8/20/2020 |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Defendant ENT Credit Union's Unopposed Request to Extend the Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Defendant Security Service Federal Credit Union's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Motion |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order re Defendant ENT Credit Union's Unopposed Request to Extend the Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint | |
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendant ENT Credit Union's Unopposed Request to Extend the Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendant Security Service Federal Credit Union's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Motion |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Proposed) Order re Defendant Security Service Federal Credit Union's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Motion |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance of Lawrence D. Stone | |
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) (Proposed) Order re Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service - Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Orders, and Motion for Consolidation served to Danielle Jack for Red Rocks Credit Union on 7/24/2020 |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service - Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Orders, and Motion for Consolidation served to Marnee Gerkhardt for Ent Credit Union on 7/24/2020 |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service - Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Orders, and Motion for Consolidation served to Ninfa Hernandez for Security Service Federal Credit Union on 7/24/2020 |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATION | |
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Order GRANTING Motion to Consolidate filed in 2020CV32226 | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Consolidation Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 42 | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Proposed) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION PURSUANT TO C.R.C.P. 42 |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Pre-Trial Order |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Re: Discovery Protocol | |
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Delay Reduction Order |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 to Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand(Security Verified 12/18/2020) |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons District Court Civil Summons |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint w/Jury Demand Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand w/ attach |