Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Landmark Fncl Corp v. Rocky Mt Foods Inc et al
A Replevin case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Denver County, CO. Judge Alex C Myers presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 18, 2021
Last Refreshed
June 28, 2023
Filing Location
Denver County, CO
Category
Replevin
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Overview
DISTRICT COURT SUMMONS
Causes of Action
1. Contractual Indemnification
2. Equitable Indemnification
3. Breach of Contract
4. Breach of Express Warranty of Merchantability C.R.S. § 4-2-313
5. Breach of Implied Warranty of Merchantability C.R.S. § 4-2-314
6. Breach of Implied Warranty – Fitness For a Particular Purpose C.R.S. § 4-2-315
7. Negligent Misrepresentation
8. Declaratory Relief
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 24, 2022Motion to Dismiss(Related Document)
Date: Feb 22, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Feb 22, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 11, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Feb 10, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Feb 10, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 25, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Jan 21, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Jan 21, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Dec 17, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Dec 16, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Dec 16, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Dec 03, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Dec 02, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Dec 02, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Nov 15, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Nov 11, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Nov 11, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Nov 09, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Nov 04, 2021Filing Other
Date: Nov 04, 2021Response(Related Document)
Date: Nov 03, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Oct 29, 2021Affidavit
Date: Oct 29, 2021Affidavit
Date: Oct 29, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Oct 29, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Oct 29, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Oct 27, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: Oct 27, 2021Order
Date: Oct 05, 2021Complaint - 3rd Party
Date: Jul 30, 2021Summons
Date: Jul 30, 2021Filing Other
Date: Jul 23, 2021Disclosure Certificate
Date: Jun 11, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: May 21, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: May 20, 2021Motion
Date: May 20, 2021Order
Date: May 14, 2021Order
Date: May 14, 2021Proposed Order - Case Management
Date: May 11, 2021Order
Date: May 06, 2021Notice
Date: Apr 19, 2021Notice
Date: Apr 19, 2021Notice
Date: Mar 30, 2021Answer
Date: Mar 26, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 15, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 12, 2021Motion
Date: Mar 12, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 05, 2021Report(Related Document)
Date: Mar 04, 2021Summons
Date: Jan 26, 2021Return of Service
Date: Jan 26, 2021Return of Service
Date: Jan 26, 2021Order
Date: Jan 19, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 18, 2021Complaint
Date: Jan 18, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
JTRL Dispo - Trial Not Held N/A |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Motion to Dismiss- Granted |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Closed N/A |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss(Related Document) Motion to Dismiss |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order re: Motion to Dismiss | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - No Print N/A |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Deadline to Respond to Third Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 6- Granted |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Deadline to Respond to Third Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 6 |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Re: Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Deadline to Respond to Third Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 6 | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Deadline to Respond to Third-Party Defendants Motion to Dismiss pursuant to C.R.C.P. 6- Granted |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Proposed) ORDER RE: UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO C.R.C.P. 6 |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Deadline to Respond to Third-Party Defendants Motion to Dismiss pursuant to C.R.C.P. 6 |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Defendants/Third Party Complainants Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to File Response to Third Party Cross Defendants Motion to Dismiss- Granted |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendants/Third Party Complainants Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to File Response to Third Party Cross Defendants Motion to Dismiss |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order on Defendants/Third Party Complainants Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to File Response to Third Party Cross Defendants Motion to Dismiss | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Defendants/Third Party Complainants' Unopposed Motion for Extension to Respond to Third Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss- Granted |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order on Defendants/Third Party Complainants' Unopposed Motion for Extension to Respond to Third Party Defendants Motion to Dismiss | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendants/Third Party Complainants' Unopposed Motion for Extension to Respond to Third Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: DEFENDANTS/THIRD PARTY COMPLAINANTS ROCKY MOUNTAIN FOODS AND DAVID GREENHOUSE UNOPPOSED MOTION FOREXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THIRD PARTY CROSS-DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS- Granted |
|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Motion Defendants/Cross Complainants Unopposed Motion (Proposed) Order on DEFENDANTS/THIRD PARTY OMPLAINANTS ROCKY MOUNTAIN FOODS AND DAVID GREENHOUSE UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THIRD PARTY CROSS-DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS | |
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) DEFENDANTS/THIRD PARTY COMPLAINANTS ROCKY MOUNTAIN FOODS AND DAVID GREENHOUSE UNOPPOSED MOTION FOREXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THIRD PARTY CROSS-DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Out-of-State Counsel's Verified Motion Requesting Admission Pro Hac Vice- Granted |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order re: Defendants/Third Party Complainants Rocky Mountain Foods and David Greenhouse Response to Courts Order To Show Cause |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Other FROM ATTY REGISTRATION OFFICE RE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE BY ATTY ARAMEH ZARGHAM OBOYLE 21PHV6791 AND CAITLIN A HILL 21PHV6792 |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response(Related Document) Defendants/Third Party Complainants Rocky Mountain Foods and David Greenhouse Response to Courts Order To Show Cause |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Verified Motion Requesting Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caitlin A. Hill | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Arameh Zargham O'Boyle | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Caitlin A. Hill | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Out-of-State Counsel's Verified Motion Requesting Admission Pro Hac Vice |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Verified Motion Requesting Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arameh Zargham O'Boyle | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT AGRI-NEO, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Agri-Neo, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue and/or Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (w/attach) |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Attachment to Third Party Defendant Agri-Neo, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue and/or Lack of Personal Jurisdiction - Declaration of Nicholas Dillon in Support of Third Party Defendant Agri-Neo, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint - 3rd Party COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS/THIRD PARTY COMPLAINANTSROCKY MOUNTAIN FOODS AND DAVID GREENHOUSE AS AGAINST AGRI NEO,INC a CANADIAN BUSINESS CORPORATIONS ACT CORPORATION w/ attach |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint by Defendants/Third Party Complainants Rocky Mountain Foods and David Greenhouse as Against Agri-Neo, Inc a Canadian Business Corporations Act Corporation | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit B - Attach to Pleading/Doc Cross Complaint vs 3rd Party Agri-Neo, Inc a Canadian Business Corporations Act Corporation by Defendants/Third Party Complainants Rocky Mountain Foods and David Greenhouse |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A - Attach to Pleading/Doc Cross Complaint vs 3rd Party Agri-Neo, Inc a Canadian Business Corporations Act Corporation by Defendants/Third Party Complainants Rocky Mountain Foods and David Greenhouse |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit C - Attach to Pleading/Doc Cross Complaint vs 3rd Party Agri-Neo, Inc a Canadian Business Corporations Act Corporation by Defendants/Third Party Complainants Rocky Mountain Foods and David Greenhouse |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Other DEFENDANTS RULE 12 STATEMENT |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Disclosure Certificate Defendants' Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Certificate |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Amended Case Management Conference Order |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Amended Case Management Conference Order |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Conference Order of May 14, 2021 (Also filed on behalf of Plaintiff) |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order PRE-TRIAL ORDER |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Case Management Proposed Case Management Order (Also filed on behalf of Defendants) |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: VIRTUAL COURTROOM PROCEEDING (WEBEX) | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice to Set Case Management Conference | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer of Defendants Rocky Mountain Foods and David Greenhouse | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order re: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order on Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order re: Status Report |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report(Related Document) Status Report |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons District Court Civil Summons |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service; Summons, Complaint w/ Exhibits, Civil Case Cover Sheet; Served on David Greenhouse; on 01/19/2021 |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service; Summons, Complaint w/ Exhibits, Civil Case Cover Sheet; Served on Sheila Colton on behalf of Rocky Mountain Foods, Inc.; on 01/19/2021 |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order DELAY REDUCTION ORDER |
|
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet |
|
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint Verified Complaint Pursuant to Rule 104 of the Colorado Rules of Civil Procedure with attachments |
|
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A part 3 to Verified Complaint Pursuant to Rule 104 of the Colorado Rules of Civil Procedure |
|
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit C to Verified Complaint Pursuant to Rule 104 of the Colorado Rules of Civil Procedure |
|
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit E to Verified Complaint Pursuant to Rule 104 of the Colorado Rules of Civil Procedure |
|
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A part 2 to Verified Complaint Pursuant to Rule 104 of the Colorado Rules of Civil Procedure |
|
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit B to Verified Complaint Pursuant to Rule 104 of the Colorado Rules of Civil Procedure |
|
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit D to Verified Complaint Pursuant to Rule 104 of the Colorado Rules of Civil Procedure |
|
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A part 1 to Verified Complaint Pursuant to Rule 104 of the Colorado Rules of Civil Procedure |