Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Margarita M Salcedo First Ltd Liability et al v. Gerry Salcedo Propt Lllp et al
A Rule 105 Quiet Title case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Denver County, CO. Judge Stephanie Lindquist Scoville presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 12, 2021
Last Refreshed
June 29, 2023
Filing Location
Denver County, CO
Category
Rule 105 Quiet Title
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Quiet Title
Status
MDL Transfer
Overview
Plaintiff, The Margarita M. Salcedo First Limited Liability Limited Partnership, LLLP,
by and through counsel, Burns, Figa & Will, P.C., for its Complaint against Defendants, states as
follows:
Causes of Action
CLAIM FOR RELIEF DETERMINATION OF INTERESTS PURSUANT TO C.R.C.P. 105
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice
Date: Jun 02, 2023Notice
Date: May 02, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Apr 26, 2023Motion(Related Document)
Date: Apr 25, 2023Proposed Order
Date: Apr 25, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 01, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 01, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 01, 2023Report
Date: Jan 20, 2023Report
Date: Jan 20, 2023Proposed Order
Date: Jan 13, 2023Motion(Related Document)
Date: Jan 13, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 03, 2023Substitution of Counsel
Date: Jan 03, 2023Notice of Withdrawal(Related Document)
Date: Dec 30, 2022Response
Date: Nov 17, 2022Reply
Date: Nov 15, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Nov 08, 2022Response(Related Document)
Date: Nov 08, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Nov 08, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Nov 08, 2022Motion to Withdraw(Related Document)
Date: Nov 03, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Nov 03, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Nov 03, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Nov 03, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Nov 03, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Nov 02, 2022Response
Date: Oct 31, 2022Proposed Order - Trial Management
Date: Oct 28, 2022Notice
Date: Oct 27, 2022Disclosure Certificate
Date: Oct 14, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Oct 10, 2022Motion
Date: Oct 10, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 05, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 05, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Oct 01, 2022Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 01, 2022Report(Related Document)
Date: Sep 30, 2022Reply
Date: Sep 26, 2022Filing Other
Date: Sep 26, 2022Reply
Date: Sep 26, 2022Disclosure Certificate
Date: Sep 19, 2022Order
Date: Sep 16, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 16, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Sep 13, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Sep 13, 2022Response
Date: Sep 12, 2022Certificate
Date: Aug 23, 2022Filing Other
Date: Aug 23, 2022Witness List
Date: Aug 22, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Aug 22, 2022Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Aug 22, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Aug 22, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment(Related Document)
Date: Aug 22, 2022Disclosure Certificate
Date: Aug 22, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Jul 29, 2022Motion
Date: Jul 27, 2022Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Jul 27, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Apr 13, 2022Proposed Order
Date: Apr 11, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Apr 11, 2022Certificate
Date: Mar 23, 2022Filing Other
Date: Mar 17, 2022Certificate of Compliance w/Rule 16
Date: Mar 14, 2022Notice
Date: Mar 07, 2022Filing Other
Date: Feb 23, 2022Filing Other
Date: Feb 18, 2022Notice
Date: Feb 07, 2022Reply(Related Document)
Date: Jan 24, 2022Order
Date: Jan 24, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 04, 2022Answer and Counterclaim(Related Document)
Date: Jan 04, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Dec 23, 2021Entry of Appearance
Date: Dec 22, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Dec 20, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Dec 20, 2021Order
Date: Nov 16, 2021Notice
Date: Nov 15, 2021Complaint(Related Document)
Date: Nov 12, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: Nov 12, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Of Partial Release Of Lis Pendens | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Closed N/A |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Setting of Status Conference w/attach to doc | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order on Unopposed Motion For Further Stay |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion For Further Stay |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Re: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion For Further Stay | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order on Defendants' Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Resolution of Related Criminal Matter |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order on Motion to Withdraw |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order on Stipulated Motion For Enlargement Of Time To File Status Report |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Report Defendants' Status Report |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Report Plaintiffs' Status Report w/attach |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 To Plaintiffs' Status Report |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Re: Stipulated Motion For Enlargement Of Time To File Status Report | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Stipulated Motion For Enlargement Of Time To File Status Report |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order on Notice of Withdrawal |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Substitution of Counsel On Behalf Of Plaintiff - Revised | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal(Related Document) Notice of Withdrawal |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Withdraw |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF RELATED CRIMINAL MATTER with attach | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 to REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF RELATED CRIMINAL MATTER - Agreement and Plan of Merger |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Vacate Trial Date | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response(Related Document) Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Resolution of Related Criminal Matter w/attach |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Resolution of Related Criminal Matter (Criminal Protection Order) |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Stipulated Motion to Vacate Trial Date (also filed on behalf of Defendants) |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order on Stipulated Motion to Vacate Trial Date |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw(Related Document) Motion to Withdraw |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Re: Motion to Withdraw |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Re: Defendants' Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Resolution of Related Criminal Matter | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order on Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendants' Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Resolution of Related Criminal Matter |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Trial Management Proposed Trial Management Order (also filed on behalf of Defendants) w/attach |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit to Proposed Trial Management Order |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Pre-Trial Conference - Thursday, 11/03/2022 @ 11:00 a.m. | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - No Print N/A |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Disclosure Certificate Plaintiffs' C.R.C.P. 16.1(k)(3) Disclosure of Rebuttal Trial Testimony |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(H) | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(H) |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Joint Status Report (also filed on behalf of all DEF)- Approved |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Rebuttal Trial Witness Testimony- Granted |
|
October 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Rebuttal Trial Witness Testimony |
|
October 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Rebuttal Trial Witness Testimony |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report(Related Document) Joint Status Report (also filed on behalf of all DEF) |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) (with attach) |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit H to Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) and Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit F to Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) and Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit G to Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) and Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit E to Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) and Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit D to Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) and Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A to Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) and Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit C to Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) and Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit B to Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) and Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 56(h) |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Disclosure Certificate Defendants' Disclosure of Trial Testimony Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 16.1(k)(3) |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order AMENDED PRE-TRIAL ORDER |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order on Joint Motion for Bifurcation of Trial |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Joint Motion for Bifurcation of Trial(also filed on behalf of Plaintiffs) |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Re: Joint Motion for Bifurcation of Trial | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit H to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit G to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit E to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit F to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit D to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit C to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit B to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Declaration of Gerardo M. Salcedo in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment(with attach) (Suppress per order dated 7/29/2022) |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (with attach) (Suppress per order dated 7/29/2022) |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Determination of Questions of Law |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Declaration of Margarita Salcedo-Hart in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness List Defendants' Witness List |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order Re: Defendants' Motion for Determination of Question of Law |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment(Related Document) PLANTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Disclosure Certificate Plaintiffs' C.R.C.P. 16.1(k)(3) Disclosure of Trial Testimony |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Protective Order |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order(also filed on behalf of plaintiffs) |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Stipulated Protective Order |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order on Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Protective Order |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order (also filed on behalf of all DEF) |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate CLERKS CERTIFICATE FOR MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION (22MD7) (RECEIVED FROM ARAPAHOE COUNTY CASE 21CV31951) |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Other COPY OF ORDER PURSUANT TO CRCP 42.1(i) (SUPREME COURT FILING 22MD7) |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Compliance w/Rule 16 Certificate of Compliance |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Other COPY OF CERTIFICATION TO THE CHIEF JUSTICE PURSUANT TO C.R.C.P. 42.1(h) (22MD7) |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Copy of Joint Motion for Consolidation and Transfer Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 42.1 (w/attach) (Supreme Court Filing) (also filed on behalf of DEFs) |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 2 to Joint Motion for Consolidation and Transfer - District Court Answers/Counterclaims |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 to Joint Motion for Consolidation and Transfer - District Court Complaints |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice to Set Trial and Case Management Conference | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply(Related Document) Reply to Counterclaims |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Pre-Trial Order |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer and Counterclaim(Related Document) Answer |
|
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO ENLARGE DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) UNOPPOSED MOTION TO ENLARGE DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Proposed) ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Delay Reduction Order |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Cases | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint(Related Document) Complaint to Quiet Title Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 105 (with attach) |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 6 to Complaint to Quiet Title Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 105 - 2021-12-31 Deed |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 2 to Complaint to Quiet Title Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 105 - Denver County Legal Descriptions |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 4 to Complaint to Quiet Title Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 105 - 2012-12-31 Deed |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 5 to Complaint to Quiet Title Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 105 - 2012-12-31 Deed |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 to Complaint to Quiet Title Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 105 - Denver County 2007 Deeds |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 3 to Complaint to Quiet Title Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 105 - 2021-11-30- Deed |