Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Csaa General Insurance Company et al v. Castle View LLC
A Negligence case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Douglas County, CO. Judge Jeffrey K Holmes presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 26, 2022
Last Refreshed
July 12, 2023
Filing Location
Douglas County, CO
Judge
Category
Negligence
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Negligence
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Defendant.
Causes of Action
1. Negligence
2. Breach of Contract
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order(Related Document)
Date: Apr 24, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Apr 24, 2023Stipulation(Related Document)
Date: Apr 24, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 28, 2023Notice(Related Document)
Date: Mar 28, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 20, 2023Proposed Order - Case Management(Related Document)
Date: Jan 20, 2023Proposed Order - Case Management
Date: Jan 19, 2023Notice
Date: Jan 17, 2023Order - Case Management
Date: Jan 17, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 12, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 12, 2023Motion
Date: Jan 12, 2023Order - Case Management
Date: Dec 20, 2022Answer w/Jury Demand
Date: Dec 20, 2022Return of Service(Related Document)
Date: Nov 29, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 27, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Oct 26, 2022Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 26, 2022Summons(Related Document)
Date: Aug 26, 2022Order - Case Management(Related Document)
Date: Aug 26, 2022Complaint w/Jury Demand(Related Document)
Date: Aug 26, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet(Related Document)
Date: Aug 26, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
JTRL Dispo - Trial Not Held N/A |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Order re Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Order re Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation(Related Document) Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Closed - Post Judgment N/A |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Notice of Settlement |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice(Related Document) Notice of Settlement |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Case Management Order |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Case Management(Related Document) Case Management Order |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Case Management Case Management Order |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order - Case Management Order to Comply - Case Management |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Order re: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Consolidate |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Order re: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Consolidate |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Consolidate |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Case Management Initial Case Management Order |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer w/Jury Demand Defendant's Answer & Jury Demand |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return of Service(Related Document) Return of Service - Bruce D Crowe (Registered Agent) on behalf of Castle View LLC on 11/21/2022 |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reopen - Post Judgment N/A |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Closed N/A |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Order Extending Time for Service of Process on Defendant |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Motion to Extend Time for Service of Process on Defendant |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Order Extending Time for Service of Process on Defendant |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit B - Affidavit of Non-Service |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit D - Attempted Service |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit C - 12615 Robinson Ranch |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit A - Colorado Secretary of State Information for Castle View |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons(Related Document) Summons- Castle View, LLC |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Case Management(Related Document) Delay Reduction Order |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Complaint w/Jury Demand(Related Document) Complaint w/Jury Demand |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet(Related Document) Civil Case Cover Sheet |