Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Beers Construction Llc, Myers And Sons Construction Lp, Weifield Group Contracting Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Colleen Kwiatkowski, N A, Reed Frederick Morris, against City Of Colorado Springs Colorado, Colorado Springs Utilities, Travelers Casualty And Surety Complany, represented by Colleen Kwiatkowski, Mary Sue Greenleaf, Ryan J Klein, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, CO, . El Paso County, CO Superior Courts with Thomas K Kane presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, CO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: March 24, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: January 09, 2023Motion
Date: February 01, 2023Reply(Related Document)
Date: February 24, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: April 06, 2023Affidavit
Date: January 09, 2023Reply(Related Document)
Date: February 24, 2023Reply
Date: February 24, 2023Reply(Related Document)
Date: February 24, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: March 03, 2023Reply(Related Document)
Date: February 24, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: March 03, 2023Reply(Related Document)
Date: February 24, 2023Motion
Date: March 24, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: March 23, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: March 03, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: March 03, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: March 03, 2023Motion
Date: March 22, 2023Reply(Related Document)
Date: February 24, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: March 22, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: February 15, 2023Motion
Date: February 01, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: March 04, 2023Motion
Date: February 01, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: March 24, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: February 24, 2023Response(Related Document)
Date: February 17, 2023Filing Other(Related Document)
Date: February 24, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: May 24, 2023Motion
Date: March 10, 2021Filing Other
Date: March 05, 2021Answer - Amended
Date: April 27, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: May 25, 2023Motion
Date: May 24, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: April 06, 2023Motion to Compel(Related Document)
Date: April 09, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: March 22, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: March 12, 2021Proposed Order
Date: May 24, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: April 06, 2023Motion
Date: May 24, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: March 10, 2021Reply(Related Document)
Date: May 25, 2021Motion
Date: May 16, 2023Motion(Related Document)
Date: May 03, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: March 29, 2021Proposed Order
Date: May 16, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: May 12, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: March 12, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: May 03, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: March 30, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: April 09, 2021Notice
Date: February 25, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: November 09, 2020Reply(Related Document)
Date: February 23, 2021Response
Date: November 30, 2020Motion
Date: March 22, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: March 30, 2021Response(Related Document)
Date: May 18, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: March 10, 2022Response(Related Document)
Date: February 17, 2023Response
Date: February 17, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: February 01, 2023Motion
Date: February 01, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: February 01, 2023Reply(Related Document)
Date: February 24, 2023Motion
Date: February 23, 2023Response(Related Document)
Date: February 17, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: February 16, 2023Response
Date: February 17, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: February 01, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: February 01, 2023Response(Related Document)
Date: February 17, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: February 01, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: February 23, 2023Notice
Date: January 10, 2023Response(Related Document)
Date: February 17, 2023Reply(Related Document)
Date: January 31, 2023Motion(Related Document)
Date: February 15, 2023Response
Date: January 24, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: January 31, 2023Motion
Date: February 01, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 01, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: February 01, 2023Motion
Date: February 01, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: February 01, 2023Response(Related Document)
Date: February 17, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: February 01, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment(Related Document)
Date: January 31, 2023Affidavit
Date: January 03, 2023Motion
Date: May 18, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: January 09, 2023Affidavit
Date: March 09, 2022Motion
Date: November 01, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: January 03, 2023Motion
Date: January 03, 2023Filing Other
Date: March 28, 2022Notice of Withdrawal
Date: October 27, 2022Notice
Date: October 13, 2022Notice
Date: November 08, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: March 09, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: March 10, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: September 09, 2021Order
Date: September 24, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: May 18, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: May 24, 2022Notice
Date: March 09, 2022Notice
Date: June 22, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: September 23, 2021Notice
Date: February 15, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: January 21, 2022Proposed Order
Date: August 13, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: September 22, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: October 06, 2021Motion
Date: January 27, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: February 08, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: November 02, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: September 17, 2021Notice
Date: September 13, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: January 27, 2022Motion
Date: September 17, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: September 08, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: September 13, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: November 01, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: March 09, 2022Motion
Date: January 21, 2022Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: January 21, 2022Motion
Date: October 04, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: September 13, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: October 04, 2021Affidavit
Date: September 17, 2021Motion
Date: September 22, 2021Reply
Date: September 09, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: October 26, 2020Proposed Order
Date: November 09, 2020Order
Date: January 13, 2021Proposed Order - Case Management(Related Document)
Date: February 18, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: November 02, 2020Motion
Date: February 09, 2021Reply
Date: December 07, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: October 27, 2020Proposed Order
Date: February 09, 2021Answer w/Jury Demand
Date: January 12, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: February 18, 2021Response(Related Document)
Date: February 16, 2021Entry of Appearance
Date: February 12, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: March 10, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: June 14, 2021Motion
Date: October 26, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: June 11, 2021Filing Other
Date: August 16, 2021Response(Related Document)
Date: September 03, 2021Motion
Date: June 11, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: May 19, 2021Notice
Date: July 29, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: August 13, 2021Answer
Date: May 07, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: August 16, 2021Answer
Date: May 07, 2021Reply(Related Document)
Date: May 07, 2021Response(Related Document)
Date: April 30, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: August 13, 2021Order
Date: December 29, 2020Motion
Date: April 27, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: October 26, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: April 27, 2021Response(Related Document)
Date: April 20, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: April 28, 2021Request
Date: September 08, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: September 22, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: April 30, 2021Answer to Counter Claim
Date: October 07, 2021Motion
Date: October 26, 2020Waiver of Service
Date: October 08, 2020Complaint
Date: October 02, 2020Motion to Compel(Related Document)
Date: August 13, 2021Summons
Date: October 02, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 02, 2020Summons
Date: October 02, 2020Entry of Appearance
Date: October 12, 2020Reply(Related Document)
Date: July 14, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: June 30, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: July 13, 2023Motion
Date: July 14, 2023Motion
Date: July 13, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: June 14, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: July 17, 2023Notice of Withdrawal
Date: July 06, 2023Response(Related Document)
Date: June 14, 2023Request(Related Document)
Date: June 16, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: June 21, 2023Notice(Related Document)
Date: June 29, 2023Reply(Related Document)
Date: June 20, 2023Notice
Date: June 22, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: June 13, 2023Response
Date: June 06, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: June 13, 2023Reply
Date: June 13, 2023Motion(Related Document)
Date: June 13, 2023Entry of Appearance
Date: June 07, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: July 28, 2023Motion
Date: July 20, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: July 20, 2023Notice
Date: June 06, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: June 30, 2023Reply
Date: July 28, 2023Notice
Date: July 13, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: July 14, 2023Response(Related Document)
Date: June 14, 2023Entry of Appearance
Date: June 26, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: July 20, 2023Response
Date: June 06, 2023Motion(Related Document)
Date: May 24, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: May 24, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: June 14, 2023Notice
Date: July 17, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: July 14, 2023Entry of Appearance
Date: June 23, 2023Motion
Date: June 23, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: June 23, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: May 16, 2023Motion
Date: June 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
JTRL Dispo - Continued N/A |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit B to Reply in Support of the City of Colorado Springs, Colorado's Rule 26(c) Motion for a Protective Order on Portions of 31 Topics in Myers & Sons Construction, LLP's Notice of C.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice to The Colorado Springs Utilities |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A to Reply in Support of the City of Colorado Springs, Colorado's Rule 26(c) Motion for a Protective Order on Portions of 31 Topics in Myers & Sons Construction, LLP's Notice of C.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice to The Colorado Springs Utilities |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) for Protective Order |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Defendant's Reply in Support of the City of Colorado Springs, Colorado's Rule 26(c) Motion for a Protective Order on Portions of 31 Topics in Myers & Sons Construction, LLP's Notice of C.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice to The Colorado Springs Utilities |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendant Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of The City Of Colorado Springs, Colorado Rule 26(c) Motion for a Protective Order on Portions of 31 Topics in Myers & Sons Construction, LLP Notice of C.R.C.P. 30(B)(6) Deposition Notice to the Colorado Springs Utilities |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Re Defendant Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of The City Of Colorado Springs, Colorado Rule 26(c) Motion for a Protective Order on Portions of 31 Topics in Myers & Sons Construction, LLP Notice of C.R.C.P. 30(B)(6) Deposition Notice to the Colorado Springs Utilities |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Order Re Defendant Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of The City Of Colorado Springs, Colorado Rule 26(c) Motion for a Protective Order on Portions of 31 Topics in Myers & Sons Construction, LLP Notice of C.R.C.P. 30(B)(6) Deposition Notice to the Colorado Springs Utilities |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) re Myers and Sons Construction, LP's Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitations |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial Setting, Status Conference & Amended CMO Deadline |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.