Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hahn Solo Consulting Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Richard Alan Levine, against Yottoy Productions Inc, represented by William R Meyer, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, CO, . Jefferson County, CO Superior Courts with Lindsay L Vangilder presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJefferson County, CO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Summons
Date: March 18, 2020Complaint
Date: March 18, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 18, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 15, 2020Proposed Order
Date: May 12, 2020Order
Date: March 24, 2020Affidavit
Date: June 15, 2020Affidavit
Date: July 13, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: May 13, 2020Order
Date: November 16, 2020Reply
Date: July 13, 2020Proposed Order
Date: June 15, 2020Response
Date: July 06, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: May 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Closed N/A |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Dismissed without Prejudice N/A |
|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit B |
|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A |
|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Kate Karcher-Clark in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Forum Non Conveniens | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Reply in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Forum Non Conveniens | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 Declaration of Iris Solomon |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 2 |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Response Signature Page |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.