Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Market At Southpark 1674 LLC v. Carefree Spas And Pools et al
A Breach Of Contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, CO. Judge Lindsay L Vangilder presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 21, 2020
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Jefferson County, CO
Judge
Category
Breach of Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Dismissal
Overview
COMPLAINT
Causes of Action
1. Breach of Lease and Guaranty - Against All Defendants
2. Unjust Enrichment – Against Carefree
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 22, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 22, 2021Stipulation(Related Document)
Date: Feb 22, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 19, 2021Stipulation(Related Document)
Date: Feb 19, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Feb 18, 2021Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 18, 2021Motion to Dismiss(Related Document)
Date: Jan 28, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 19, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 19, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 13, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 13, 2021Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 13, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Jan 08, 2021Notice
Date: Jan 08, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Jan 08, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Jan 08, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Jan 08, 2021Motion(Related Document)
Date: Jan 08, 2021Proposed Order
Date: Jan 08, 2021Order
Date: Jan 06, 2021Answer
Date: Dec 08, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Dec 02, 2020Motion to Quash(Related Document)
Date: Nov 18, 2020Return of Service
Date: Nov 12, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: Oct 29, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: Oct 21, 2020Summons
Date: Oct 21, 2020Complaint
Date: Oct 21, 2020Summons
Date: Oct 21, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice of All Claims- Granted |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation(Related Document) Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice of All Claims |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Closed N/A |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissed without Prejudice N/A |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Re: Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice of All Claims |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation(Related Document) Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice of All Claims |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) RE: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss(Related Document) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Comlaint and Amended Comlaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Amended Order GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Substituted Service |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Amended Order GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Formally Serve Complaint |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Formally Serve Complaint |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Plaintiff's Motion for Substituted Service |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint- Granted |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Re Motion for Enlargement of Time to Formally Serve Complaint 1/14/21 10am-12pm |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice to Set Case Management Conference | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Re Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Formally Serve Complaint |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Plaintiff's Motion for Substituted Service |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Re Motion for Substituted Service |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit 2 - Amended Affidavit of Service |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit 1 - Carefree Secretary of State Listing |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Service on Karen Prideaux |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit 4 - Carefree Spas Website |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit 1 to First Amended Complaint - Lease |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Delay Reduction Order - Case Management Conference |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Motion to Quash Service of summons and complaint |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash(Related Document) Motion to Quash Ser vice of summons and complaint |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Submission of Affidavit of Service |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service- Summons, Complaint, Cover Sheet to Carefree Spas and Pools |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return Mail N/A |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) CIVIL PROCEDURE ORDER |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons - Karen Prideaux | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons - Carefree Spas and Pools LLC | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 - Lease |