Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ten10 LLC et al v. Gahan, Patrick et al
A Breach Of Contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, CO. Judge Todd Vriesman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 09, 2022
Last Refreshed
July 12, 2023
Filing Location
Jefferson County, CO
Judge
Category
Breach of Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Overview
Attorneys for Plaintiffs:
Name: Eric B. Liebman
William F. Jones
Tanya A. Sevy
MOYE WHITE LLP
Address: 16 Market Square, 6th Floor
1400 16th Street
Denver, CO 80202-1486
Phone No.: (303) 292-2900
Fax No.: (303) 292-4510
E-Mail: eric.liebman@moyewhite.com
billy.jones@moyewhite.com
tanya.sevy@moyewhite.com
Causes of Action
1. Declaratory Judgment – The Alleged AMG Loan Is A Capital Contribution, Not A Valid Third-Party Loan
2. Declaratory Judgment That The LOC Is An Invalid Capital Contribution, Not A Valid, Third-Party Loan
3. Declaratory Judgment – The Alleged AMG Loan and the LOC Are Invalid And Unauthorized Obligations of Alchemy
4. Indemnification – AAH and Kolb Should Indemnify Alchemy For Any And All Losses Related To The Alleged AMG Loan and the LOC
5. Breach of Contract – Operating Agreement
6. Breach of Fiduciary Duty
7. Breach of Duty of Good Faith and Fair Dealing
8. Promissory Estoppel
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order(Related Document)
Date: May 02, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: May 02, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: May 01, 2023Reply
Date: Apr 11, 2023Response - Motion to Dismiss
Date: Mar 28, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 24, 2023Motion
Date: Mar 22, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 22, 2023Reply
Date: Mar 10, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 10, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 10, 2023Reply
Date: Mar 10, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 08, 2023Motion
Date: Mar 08, 2023Motion
Date: Mar 08, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 08, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 07, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 07, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 06, 2023Motion to Dismiss(Related Document)
Date: Mar 03, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 03, 2023Response
Date: Mar 01, 2023Response
Date: Mar 01, 2023Notice of Change of Address
Date: Feb 27, 2023Motion
Date: Feb 25, 2023Motion
Date: Feb 24, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 24, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 24, 2023Motion
Date: Feb 24, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 24, 2023Motion
Date: Feb 24, 2023Substitution of Counsel
Date: Feb 14, 2023Return of Service
Date: Feb 10, 2023Return of Service
Date: Feb 10, 2023Notice
Date: Feb 08, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 07, 2023Motion
Date: Feb 07, 2023Motion
Date: Feb 03, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 03, 2023Return of Service
Date: Jan 31, 2023Return of Service
Date: Jan 25, 2023Return of Service
Date: Jan 25, 2023Return of Service
Date: Jan 25, 2023Return of Service
Date: Jan 25, 2023Return of Service
Date: Jan 12, 2023Notice
Date: Jan 05, 2023Summons
Date: Dec 23, 2022Complaint - Amended
Date: Dec 14, 2022Order
Date: Dec 12, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: Dec 09, 2022Complaint w/Jury Demand
Date: Dec 09, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order to Compel Arbitration |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order to Dismiss All Claims Against Marquee |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Closed N/A |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:re Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Defendant Marquee Funding Partners, LLC's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss (or Stay) All Claims Against it in First Amended Complaint, Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response - Motion to Dismiss Response in Opposition to Defendant Marquee Funding Partner, LLCs Motion to Dismiss Case |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: RE Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Marquees Motion to Dismiss- Granted |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Marquees Motion to Dismiss |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) RE Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Marquees Motion to Dismiss |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order RE Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order RE Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) RE: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Re Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: RE Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate- Granted |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: RE Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration- Granted |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order re: Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss(Related Document) Defendant Marquee Funding Partners, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (or Stay) All Claims Against it in First Amended Complaint, Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Granting Defendant Marquee Funding Partners, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (or Stay) All Claims Against it in First Amended Complaint, Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit 1 to Defendant Marquee Funding Partners, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (or Stay) All Claims Against it in First Amended Complaint, Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Notice of Firm Address Change |
|
February 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion PLAINTIFFS [CORRECTED] UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) RE Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) RE Defendant Marquee Funding Partners, LLC's Unopposed Motion for One-Week Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendant Marquee Funding Partners, LLC's Unopposed Motion for One-Week Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) RE Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Counsel Notice of Substitution of Counsel |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service of Subpoena to Produce, and Notice to Subpoena Recipients on JPMorgan Securities, LLC by serving CT Corporation System - Samantha Peck as Registered Agent at 7700 E. Arapahoe Road, Suite 220, Centennial, CO 80112 on February 9, 2023 at 2:26 p.m. |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service of Subpoena to Produce and Notice to Subpoena Recipients on JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.by serving CT Corporation System - Samantha Peck as Registered Agent at 7700 E. Arapahoe Road, Suite 220, Centennial, CO 80112 on February 9, 2023 at 2:27 p.m. |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Exhibit F to Motion to Consolidate | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit F |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) re Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 to Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) re Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit E to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit C to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit D to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service of Subpoena to Produce upon JP Morgan Chase & Company by serving CT Corporation - Samantha Peck as Registered Agent at 7700 E. Arapahoe Road, Suite 220, Centennial, CO 80112 on January 24, 2023 at 11:20 a.m. |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service of Summons, First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, Complaint and Jury Demand, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Plaintiffs Notice of Related Case; and Civil Procedure Order upon Alder Alchemy Holdings LLC on 01-04-23 at 2:17 p.m. at 1821 Logan Ave., Cheyenne, WY 82001 by leaving with Julie Leander, Secretary of Corporation Service Company authorized to receive service of process |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service of Summons, First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, Complaint and Jury Demand, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Plaintiffs Notice of Related Case; List of Dates Served; and Civil Procedure Order upon Marquee Funding Partners on 01-05-23 at 10:39 a.m. at 3405 Dallas Hwy., Suite 827, Marietta, GA 30064 by leaving with Marna Freedman, Operations Manager, authorized to accept service |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service of Summons, First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, Complaint and Jury Demand, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Plaintiffs Notice of Related Case; and Civil Procedure Order upon Patrick Joseph Gahan on 01-03-2023 at 11:20 a.m. at 3660 Somerset Dr., SW, Marietta, GA 30064 by personal service; |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service of Summons, First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, Complaint and Jury Demand, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Plaintiffs Notice of Related Case; and Civil Procedure Order upon Optima CB, LLC by serving Amber Arends, VP of Business Development authorized to accept service for Reg. Agent Wysocki Law Group at 4582 South Ulster St., Ste 950, Denver, CO 80237 on 01-12-2023 at 10:41 a.m. |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Affidavit of Service Marquee Funding Partners |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case |
|
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Complaint - Amended First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Civil Procedure Order |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint w/Jury Demand |