Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Aspen Forest 8th Street Llc et al vs The City of Aspen et al
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Pitkin County, CO. Judge Anne K. Norrdin presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 25, 2022
Last Refreshed
July 12, 2023
Filing Location
Pitkin County, CO
Judge
Overview
Causes of Action
1. Declaratory Judgment pursuant to C.R.C.P. 57
2. C.R.C.P. 106(a
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order(Related Document)
Date: May 11, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: May 11, 2023Motion
Date: May 11, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: May 11, 2023Proposed Order - Case Management(Related Document)
Date: May 11, 2023Notice
Date: Apr 27, 2023Answer
Date: Mar 27, 2023Notice
Date: Mar 13, 2023Notice
Date: Feb 01, 2023Stipulation
Date: Jan 31, 2023Proposed Order
Date: Jan 31, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 25, 2023Motion
Date: Jan 20, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 20, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Dec 13, 2022Proposed Order - Case Management(Related Document)
Date: Dec 06, 2022Notice
Date: Nov 23, 2022Answer
Date: Oct 07, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Sep 23, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: May 05, 2022Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: May 04, 2022Motion
Date: May 04, 2022Response
Date: Apr 18, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Apr 08, 2022Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Apr 07, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Apr 07, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: Mar 22, 2022Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 22, 2022Complaint - Amended(Related Document)
Date: Mar 08, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Mar 01, 2022Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 24, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Feb 24, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 18, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: Feb 16, 2022Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: Feb 16, 2022Waiver of Service
Date: Jan 27, 2022Order
Date: Jan 27, 2022Complaint w/Jury Demand
Date: Jan 25, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 25, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Amended Case Management Order |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order re Stipulated Joint Motion Regarding Case Management |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Stipulated Joint Motion Regarding Case Management |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) [Proposed] Order re Stipulated Joint Motion Regarding Case Management |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Case Management(Related Document) [Proposed] Amended Case Management Order |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Status Conference | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Defendants City of Aspen and City of Aspen City Council's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance N/A |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proceeding Case N/A |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Status Conference | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Status Conference | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Stipulated Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases and for Related Relief |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Regarding Stipulated Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases and for Related Relief | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Regarding Defendants City of Aspen and the City of Aspen City Council's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Written Discovery Requests |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendants City of Aspen and the City of Aspen City Council's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Written Discovery Requests |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Regarding Defendants City of Aspen and the City of Aspen City Council's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Written Discovery Requests |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Case Management Order |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Case Management(Related Document) [Proposed] Case Management Order |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Amended Complaint | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order re Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Out of Time |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order re Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Out of Time |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Out of Time |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A - Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 - Colorado Lawyer Senate Bill 15 Impact Fee Article May 2002. |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A to Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order re Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint |
|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) [Proposed] Order re Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint |
|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Complaint - Amended(Related Document) Complaint - Amended |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) Exhibit 1 |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Proposed Order re Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order re Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Proposed Order re Defendants City of Aspen and the City of Aspen City Council's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Defendants City of Aspen and the City of Aspen City Council's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order re Defendants City of Aspen and the City of Aspen City Council's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service Waiver and Acceptance of Service |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order DELAY REDUCTION ORDER AND ORDER TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGES BOYD, LYNCH, NEILEY, NORRDIN, AND SELDIN |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint w/Jury Demand | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 - Ranch Station Subdivision Survey |