Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC v. LOOMIS, SARAH E
A S15 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Purchase Debt case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT. Judge Tammy D. Geathers presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 10, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 21, 2023
Filing Location
Hartford County, CT
Judge
Category
S15 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Purchase Debt
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: Aug 04, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 11/12/2020 HON TAMMY GEATHERS
Date: Nov 12, 2020MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: Nov 06, 2020ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: Sep 30, 2020SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: Sep 10, 2020SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: Sep 10, 2020MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: Sep 10, 2020EXHIBITS
Date: Sep 10, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 11/12/2020 HON TAMMY GEATHERS | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL-GENERAL RESULT: HON TAMMY GEATHERS | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS |