Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CARR, DASHON v. RIVERA, TALISHA
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT. Judge HON SUZANNE CARON presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 20, 2022
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2022
Filing Location
Hartford County, CT
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2022 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL RESULT: HON Suzanne Caron | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 5/19/2022 HON Suzanne Caron | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 5/3/2022 HON Suzanne Caron | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
May 03, 2022 | Hearing | ||
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA BY SELF-REP PARTY - PB SEC 7-19 RESULT: Granted 5/2/2022 HON Suzanne Caron Last Updated: Result Information - 05/03/2022 | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE Last Updated: Entry Number - 05/02/2022 | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WAIVE ENTRY FEE AND PAY COSTS OF SERVICE RESULT: Granted 4/25/2022 HON Suzanne Caron | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT CONCERNING CHILDREN | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | PENDENTE LITE MOTION FOR MODIFICATION - CUSTODY, VISITATION Order to Show Cause | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EMERGENCY EX PARTE ORDER OF CUSTODY Order to Show Cause RESULT: Order 5/3/2022 HON Suzanne Caron | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | FINDING OF INABILITY TO PAY PARENTING EDUCATION PROGRAM FEE CGS SEC. 46b-69b(c) | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EMERGENCY EX PARTE ORDER OF CUSTODY RESULT: Order 5/3/2022 HON Suzanne Caron | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WAIVE ENTRY FEE AND PAY COSTS OF SERVICE RESULT: Granted 4/20/2022 HON Suzanne Caron | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER HEARING AND NOTICE | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION - PUBLIC ASSISTANCE | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CUSTODY APPLICATION | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT CONCERNING CHILDREN | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC COURT ORDERS (JD-FM-158) | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE |