Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CITIZENS BANK, N.A. v. HERON, NANCY Et Al
A P00 - Property - Foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT. Judge Emmet L. Cosgrove presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 25, 2021
Last Refreshed
March 29, 2024
Filing Location
New London County, CT
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
P00 - Property - Foreclosure
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION
Date: Feb 15, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/7/2022 HON EMMET COSGROVE
Date: Mar 07, 2022RETURNED MAIL
Date: Feb 08, 2022DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF DEFENSE PB 13-19
Date: Jan 27, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: Jan 26, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/12/2022 BY THE CLERK
Date: Jan 12, 2022DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF DEFENSE PB 13-19
Date: Jan 04, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: Nov 30, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: Oct 25, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 25, 2021SUMMONS
Date: Oct 25, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | Status Conference | ||
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION RESULT: BY THE PLAINTIFF | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/7/2022 HON EMMET COSGROVE | |
March 07, 2022 | Short Calendar SC-02 #003 | ||
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO DISCLOSE DEFENSE RESULT: Granted 3/7/2022 HON EMMET COSGROVE Last Updated: Result Information - 03/07/2022 | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF DEFENSE PB 13-19 | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/12/2022 BY THE CLERK | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Granted 1/12/2022 BY THE CLERK | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF DEFENSE PB 13-19 | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE MEDIATION TIME PERIOD EXPIRED | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE MEDIATION-COMPLIANCE WITH P.A.09-209 (NO DOCUMENT) SEE FORM# JD-CV-109 | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE MEDIATION – ELIGIBLE CASE (NO DOCUMENT) | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE MEDIATION PLAINTIFF’S COMPLIANCE WITH SERVICE (NO DOCUMENT) |