Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Steele Robert, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Rosner Hallen David Esq., against American Safety Casualty Insurance Company, Lexon Insurance Company Dis 12 7 17, M & M Cars Trucks & Vans Inc., represented by Hopkins Ronald Warren, Ingle Richard F., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William F. Fahey presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management680 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 04, 2017 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions64 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time681 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 23, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF MINUTE ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE
Date: October 24, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: November 17, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 17, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: February 20, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 14, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 14, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 03, 2020DEFEDANT M&M CARS, TRUCKS & VANS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; ETC
Date: December 06, 2017NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: February 02, 2018Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: June 14, 2019Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF CONTINUED MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT HEARING
Date: April 24, 2020Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: May 04, 2020Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: May 04, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT
Date: July 10, 2020Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: July 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT)
Date: August 14, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT
Date: February 05, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: February 02, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 25, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 14, 2020Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: M & M Cars, Trucks & Vans, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Supplemental Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: M & M Cars, Trucks & Vans, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Document:CCP 170.6 Application Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Transferring Department 44) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Judgment on Arbitration Award; Filed by: Clerk; As to: M & M Cars, Trucks & Vans, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: M & M Cars, Trucks & Vans, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00General Denial Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Document:Objection Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees re Michelle A. Cook; Filed by: Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Other - Compendium of Exhibits; Filed by: Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Document:General Denial Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Objection Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment (TO ADD JUDGMENT DEBTORS;) Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Attorney Fees: Filed By: Robert Steele (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees (re Christopher P. Barry) Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees re Christopher P. Barry; Filed by: Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment TO ADD JUDGMENT DEBTORS;; Filed by: Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Judgment (on Arbitration Award) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by M & M Cars, Trucks & Vans, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Other - (Compendium of Exhibits) Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment) Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award by Plaintiff ;...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees (re Michelle A. Cook) Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-31 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition) Filed by M & M Cars, Trucks & Vans, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Amended Judgment) Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by M & M Cars, Trucks & Vans, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Amended) Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: April 14, 2022Certificate of Mailing for ([Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Notice (of Reassignment) Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Transferring Department 44)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Amended Judgment on Arbitration Award)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Filed by Ali Parvaneh (Attorney)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by M & M Cars, Trucks & Vans, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: April 25, 2022Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: November 16, 2021Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Defendant's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Transferring Department 44) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For ) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For )) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continued Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment) Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00(Amended) Judgment on Arbitration Award Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieve...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Ali Parvaneh (Attorney)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by M & M Cars, Trucks & Vans, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling) Filed by M & M Cars, Trucks & Vans, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((Further Status Conference))
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Declaration ( of Eric J. Bautista re Further Status Conference)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Other - (Compendium of Exhibits)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees (re Christopher P. Barry)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees (re Michelle A. Cook)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Declaration (OF TSOLIK KAZANDJIAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Transferring Department 44) of 06/11/2020)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Judgment (on Arbitration Award)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/15/2020)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For 5/28/20))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Transferring Department 44))
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/16/2019, Judgment on Arbitration Award)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Declaration (OF TSOLIK KAZANDJIAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For 5/28/20) of 04/21/2020)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award by Plaintiff ;...))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice (of Reassignment)
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Declaration (OF HALLEN D. ROSNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment (TO ADD JUDGMENT DEBTORS;)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel])
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF HALLEN D. ROSNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (( Laurie Miller, CSR # 6457))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice (Amended Notice of Motion to Amend Judgment to Add Judgment Debtors)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff?s Notice of Continued Motion to Amend Judgment Hearing)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Defendant's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel) of 07/10/2020)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Amended Judgment)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice (of Errata re Plaintiff?s Motion to Amend Judgment to Add Judgment Debtors)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff?s Reply in Support of Motion to Amend Judgment to Add Judgment Debtors)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieve...))
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Amended Judgment on Arbitration Award))
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Defendant's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continued Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Amended)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON PLAINTIF'F'S MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT TO ADD JUDGMENT DEBTORS)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment))
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00(Amended) Judgment on Arbitration Award
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 14, 2022Reply to Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For ) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Robert Steele (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.