Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Barnson, Betsy P.O. Box, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Pro Per, against Democratic National Committee, Does 1 To 100, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Presidential Inaugural Committee, Xxxxxxx, Xxxxx, (total of 7) See All represented by Myers, Steven R., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with ETHAN P. SCHULMAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a case between Betsy Barnson as the plaintiff and xxxxx xxxxxxx, et al. as the defendant. The case number is CGC-15-543764. The document provides details of the service of summons to xxxxx x...
SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF BARNSON, BETSY
Date: September 26, 2017CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE DISMISSAL OF APPEAL (A168422 DIV 4) (APPEAL FILED 8/7/23)
Date: April 10, 2024ORDER CONTINUING HEARING
Date: May 22, 2023ORDER GRANTING xxxxx xxxxxxx IV'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE AND DISMISS
Date: June 07, 2023CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARNSON, BETSY
Date: March 18, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100208400) FILED BY APPELLANT BARNSON, BETSY
Date: August 07, 2023NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 8/7/23) SENT TO APPELLANT BARNSON, BETSY
Date: August 18, 2023NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 8/7/23) A168422 DIV 4 SENT TO APPELLANT BARNSON, BETSY
Date: September 26, 2023ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL (SEE SCAN) (A168422 DIV 4)
Date: April 16, 2024REMITTITUR DISMISSED (A168422 DIV 4)
Date: April 17, 2024CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARNSON, BETSY
Date: May 14, 2019CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARNSON, BETSY
Date: March 02, 2020CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (NO S.A.S.E.) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARNSON, BETSY
Date: July 30, 2020NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 21, 2015CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARNSON, BETSY
Date: June 02, 2015CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: August 07, 2023CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARNSON, BETSY
Date: October 07, 2015COURT RECORDING REQUEST (TRANSACTION ID # 100189502) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARNSON, BETSY
Date: February 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2024 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR DISMISSED (A168422 DIV 4) | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL (SEE SCAN) (A168422 DIV 4) | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE SETTLED TO SATISFACTION OF THE PARTIES, EACH PARTY SHALL BEAR THEIR OWN ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 210075411) AS TO DEFENDANT xxxxx xxxxxxx, IV (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS xxxxx xxxxxxx) | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE DISMISSAL OF APPEAL (A168422 DIV 4) (APPEAL FILED 8/7/23) | |
April 10, 2024 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-10-2024 CONTINUED TO AUG-14-2024 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF APPEAL. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 8/7/23) (A168422 DIV 4) SENT TO APPELLANT BARNSON, BETSY | |
December 12, 2023 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR APR-10-2024 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF APPEAL. THE DEC-12-2023 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.