Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bakhit, Fatmeh filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Christopher R. Abernathy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2018 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time114 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): FL-960 IS NOT A FORM WE FILE IN CIVIL. |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY OF RECORD FILED BY RANIA HASAN. |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Remove Attorney from Case REMOVE ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER ABERNATHY FROM CASE. |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER AFTER HEARING AND FINDINGS FILED |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO QUASH PETITIONER'S SERVICE OF RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY RESPONDENT FATMEH BAKHIT DAVID COHN,JUDGE CLERK: ERIN MUELLER COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA;12612 COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER ABERNATHY PRESENT FOR PETITIONER. PETITIONER RANIA HASAN PRESENT ATTORNEY MOTAZ M GERGES PRESENT FOR RESPONDENT. RESPONDENT FATMEH BAKHIT PRESENT GERARD BROWN PRESENT. SHAHOUD KHALIL PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD - MOTION - FATMEH BAKHIT'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF RESTRAINING ORDER IS HEARD. - PROVISIONALLY QUALIFIED INTERPRETER REEM HAZBOUN IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET ENGLISH TO ARABIC AND ARABIC TO ENGLISH FOR SHAHOUD KHALIL. AN OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND ALL JUDICIAL COUNCIL PROCEDURES AND GUIDELINES HAVE BEEN FOLLOWED PURSUANT TO GC 68561. THE COURT FINDS THE INTERPRETER IS QUALIFIED TO INTERPRET. COURT MAKES FINDINGS PURSUANT TO AB2370. - 10:43 PROVISIONALLY QUALIFIED INTERPRETER SWORN. WITNESS -- SHAHOUD KHALIL IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. - 10:48 WITNESS -- REEM HAZBOUN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. - 10:49 WITNESS -- FATMEH BAKHIT IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. - 11:01 WITNESS -- RANIA HASAN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. - AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT : COURT FINDS: FATMEH BAKHIT'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF RESTRAINING ORDER IS DENIED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO QUASH PETITIONER'S SERVICE OF RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY RESPONDENT FATMEH BAKHIT |
|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PETITIONERS NTC OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE TO STRIKE REPLY PLEADING OF RESPONDENT FILED. |
|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed SUPPLEMENTAL DEC OF RESPONDENT IN REPLY TO PETITIONERS OPPO TO MTN TO QUASH FILED. |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/08/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.