Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Alvarez Ramirez -v- DOES 1-10 Print
On March 28, 2022 a breach of contract/warranty unlimited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Winston Keh presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 28, 2022
Last Refreshed
March 05, 2024
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Tanada, Stephanie;Category
Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
VERIFIED CROSS COMPLAINT FOR
PARTITION BY SALE OF REAL
PROPERTY.
SEVERANCE OF JOINT TITLE
§ 683.2(a)(2)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Order Filed Re:
Date: Jun 07, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: Apr 19, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: Mar 27, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: Mar 02, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: Feb 07, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: Nov 10, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: Oct 17, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: Aug 03, 2022Declaration of Good Faith Attempt to Meet Confer
Date: Jul 07, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: Jul 07, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: Jul 07, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Apr 12, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: Apr 12, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Mar 28, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Mar 28, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2024 |
Department V11 - Victorville
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certified - Registered Interpreter The interpreter is certified or registered for the language to be interpreted. The interpreter s identification has been verified by the Court using an identification badge issued by the Judicial Council or other documentation accompanied by photo identification. The interpreter oath has been administered and/or placed on file with the court administrator. |
|
December 06, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received Substitution of attorney |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed to Amended Complaint filed 6/7/2023 |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received verfied Answer to amended complaint |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed Order after hearing, filed 6/9/23 |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $5.35 credit card paid on 7/20/23 for fax, copy, env/postage |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received Order after Hearing |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Filed First Amended Complaint filed by Gabriel Alvarez Ramirez |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: granting motion for leave to amend |
|
June 07, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Filed Notice of Hearing |
|
April 26, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed filed by Plaintiff filed on 4/19/23 |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff filed on 4/19/23 |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed to Cross Complaint filed by Cross Defendant filed on 4/19/23 |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Default: Defendant in 1st Cross Complaint Gabriel Alvarez Ramirez still has time to answer. Served on 3/1/23. |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $3.00 visa paid on 3/27/23 for fax fees |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to: | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Order after hearing |
|
February 21, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Request and Order is required to Continue Hearing. There is no ORder attached to the document. Please revise and resubmit |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint Filed 1st Cross-Complaint filed |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed by USPS Certified Mail : Verified Cross-Complaint for Partition by Sale & POS |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $24.00 VS paid on 1.26.23 for Fax Fees |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received Verified Cross-Complaint |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Declaration of demurring or moving party in support of automatic extension is returned as the first amended complaint has not been filed as of yet. |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: 8/22/22 Demurrer hearing |
|
October 10, 2022 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Fax Received order |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $6 credit card paid 10/13/22 for fax |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certified - Registered Interpreter The interpreter is certified or registered for the language to be interpreted. The interpreter s identification has been verified by the Court using an identification badge issued by the Judicial Council or other documentation accompanied by photo identification. The interpreter oath has been administered and/or placed on file with the court administrator. |
|
August 22, 2022 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Balance Paid on Case $481.00 Visa paid on 8/9/22 for fees due |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Balance Due on Case $481.00 ($435.00 1st appearance and $30.00 court reporter and $16.00 fax filing of demurrer) |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed Points and authrotieis in support of Defendant's demurrer to plaintiff's unverified original complaint Filed by Defendant Susana Ramirez Mesa on Complaint filed 3/28/22 |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Good Faith Attempt to Meet & Confer Declaration of demurring or moving party in support of automatic extension filed by Defendant Susana Ramirez Mesa |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed Notice of defendant's demurrer and demurrer to plaintiff's unverified origianl complaint |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed Notice of defts Demurrer and demurrer to plaintiff's unverifed original complaint, points and authorities in support of demurrer to plaintiff's unverified original complaint, declaration of demurring or moving party in support of automatic extension ccp 430.41 served via mail served on 7/6/22 served Plaintiff Gabriel Alvare4z Ramirez Filed by Defendant Susana Ramirez Mesa |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Fax Received Demurrer |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed Notice of defts Demurrer and demurrer to plaintiff's unverifed original complaint, points and authorities in support of demurrer to plaintiff's unverified original complaint, declaration of demurring or moving party in support of automatic extension ccp 43 |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Fax Received declaration of demurring or moving party |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by 435.00 Filing Fee paid for on 03/28/22 for Complaint |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received |