Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Salazar, Hector, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Prestige Law Firm, against Barrett Business Services, Inc., Bbsi, Does 1-100, Inclusive, Weber Distribution, Llc, Weber Logistics, (total of 5) See All represented by Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo, Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with David E Driscoll presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2023 |
CategoryWrongful Termination Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 11, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 04, 2024Answer Filed
Date: July 25, 2023Answer Filed
Date: October 30, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: November 01, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: April 26, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 11, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 04, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 26, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: March 01, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: January 04, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 26, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: October 30, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 04, 2024Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: January 04, 2024Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 11, 2023Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: January 04, 2024Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 25, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: February 20, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2024 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
March 11, 2024 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed TSC: 3/15/24 |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically Reply ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Alternatively Stay Action |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection #14385843- Your eFiling submission is being returned for the following reasons: Joinder has not been reserved prior to submitting. Joinders require their own reservation similar to any other motion. Please correct and resubmit. Should you have any questions, you may contact the clerk's office at 909-708-8678 Monday - Friday from 8am - 3pm. |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically to Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiff |
|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed of Martin S. Li in support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration |
|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed of Bonnie Aguilar in support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration |
|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed of Teres Fonseca in support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration |
|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed in support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.