Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Torres, Ralph Francisco, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited case represented by Aegis Law Firm, against Does 1-20 , Inclusive, Merit Aluminum Foundry Inc., represented by Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Cohn, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2023 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a class action lawsuit filed by Ralph Francisco Torres, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated, against Merit Aluminum Foundry Inc., Merit Aluminum Inc., and DOES 1 through 20. The complaint alleges several violatio...
Declaration Filed
Date: April 12, 2024Ntc of Cost for Clerk/Reporter Trans on Appeal Filed/Mailed
Date: March 29, 2024Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: March 04, 2024Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: February 06, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 23, 2024Motion to Stay
Date: April 12, 2024Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: February 22, 2024Notice of Appeal on Order or Motion Filed - Court of Appeal
Date: February 21, 2024Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript On Appeal Filed
Date: April 12, 2024Response Filed to:
Date: February 02, 2024Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed
Date: March 19, 2024Proof of Service
Date: April 12, 2024Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: July 17, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: December 06, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: June 08, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 08, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 08, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 16, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 24, 2024Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: July 17, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 30, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 08, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: August 30, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: September 14, 2023Objection Filed
Date: January 30, 2024Notice Filed
Date: February 01, 2024Answer Filed
Date: September 25, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: September 25, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: December 06, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed
Date: February 02, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: January 24, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: December 06, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: September 14, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 27, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: December 06, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 24, 2024Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 25, 2023Proof of Service
Date: December 07, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: June 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2024 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
June 12, 2024 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
May 02, 2024 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed Joint Informal Discovery Conference Statement |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration Filed (Declarations) | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Stay Action |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript On Appeal Filed | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Comment) | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
GC70632- Reporters Transcript Trust Fee PAID |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
GC70632- Reporters Transcript Trust Fee PAID |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.