Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SALMON vs MCMAHON
An Unlimited Civil Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. Judge Angel M. Bermudez presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 28, 2022
Last Refreshed
April 24, 2023
Filing Location
Riverside County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Unlimited Civil Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion CMC vacated and TSC set |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail re: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEPHEN SALMON |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEPHEN SALMON |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail re: Answer on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEPHEN SALMON |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEPHEN SALMON |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration re: Inability to Comply with Meet and Confer Requirement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEPHEN SALMON |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail re: Declaration on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEPHEN SALMON |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Denied on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEPHEN SALMON |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Department Assignment |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Counsel. |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Case |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference |
|
October 25, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference Vacated Judge: Angel M. Bermudez |
|
October 10, 2020 | hearing |
Court on its Own Motion CMC vacated and TSC set Completed Judge: Angel M. Bermudez |
|
April 25, 2020 | hearing |
Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Angel M. Bermudez |