Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JOHN GOFFIGAN -N- BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN
A Dissolution W/O Minor Children case was filed in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Christopher R. Abernathy presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
November 20, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Gassner, Michael;Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2021 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment STATUS: FAMILY LAW | |
September 24, 2020 | hearing | Vacate Hearing Scheduled Comment VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/18/21 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCC. | |
September 24, 2020 | hearing | Notice of Entry of Judg. filed - Marital status terminates Comment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 09/24/20 | |
September 24, 2020 | hearing | Family Law Judgment Filed Comment FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN OF JOHN GOFFIGAN FILED FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN OF JOHN GOFFIGAN ORDERED ENTERED 09/24/20 COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL) DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL) ACTION - COMPLETE | |
September 10, 2020 | hearing | Document Received Comment JUDGMENT PKT RECEIVED. | |
September 02, 2020 | hearing | Fee Payment Comment FEE PAYMENT 200902-0141-CK FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT 200902-0141-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 59171 | |
August 19, 2020 | hearing | Notice Sent re: Comment NOTICE OF RETURNED JUDGMENT SENT. YOUR JUDGMENT IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S) THE ADDRESS ON YOUR FORMS DOES NOT MATCH THE ADDRESS THAT WE HAVE ON FILE. PLEASE REVISE OR SUBMIT NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS. | |
July 29, 2020 | hearing | Miscellaneous Document Filed Comment NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R. ABERNATHY, ESQ FILED. | |
July 23, 2020 | hearing | Document Received Comment JUDGMENT PKT RECEIVED. | |
July 07, 2020 | hearing | Fee Payment Comment FEE PAYMENT 200707-0042-CK FCP/ 6.00 PAYMT 200707-0042-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 5864 | |
July 07, 2020 | hearing | Fee Payment Comment FEE PAYMENT 200707-0039-CS FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT | |
December 19, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment FAMILY LAW SHORT CAUSE TRIAL | |
December 19, 2019 | hearing | Short Cause Court Trial Original Type Short Cause Court Trial Hearing Time 01:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment FAMILY LAW SHORT CAUSE TRIAL | |
November 26, 2019 | hearing | Attachment to Minute Order Comment ATTACHMENT TO 11/26/19 MINUTE ORDER | |
November 26, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment FAMILY LAW MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: CHRISTINA SMITH COURT REPORTER KAREN DIGGS;7789 BAILIFF: C J SANCHEZ - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER, JOHN GOFFIGAN, PRESENT TELEPHONICALLY . ATTORNEY JAMES J. KENNY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. RESPONDENT BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN PRESENT ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R. ABERNATHY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. WITNESS -- EACH PARTY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. EACH ATTORNEY INQUIRES OF THEIR CLIENT. WRITTEN STIPULATION ON SPECIFIC ISSUES AS ATTACHED IS APPROVED BY COURT AND ORDERED INCORPORATED INTO THE MINUTE ORDER BY REFERENCE AS THOUGH FULLY SET FORTH HEREIN,AND EACH OF THE PARTIES IS DIRECTED TO EXECUTE ALL THE PROVISIONS OF THAT ORDER. **STATUS TAKEN** THE COURT FINDS THAT THE STATUTORY AND JURISDICTIONAL RESIDENT REQUIREMENTS ARE MET. THE COURT FINDS JURISDICTION WAS ACQUIRED BY BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN ON 04/19/18 DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE GRANTED ON GROUNDS OF IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES. MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES UPON SIGNING OF JUDGMENT NOTICE - CAUTION: YOU ARE NOT OFFICIALLY DIVORCED UNTIL JUDGMENT IS SIGNED BY A JUDICIAL OFFICER INDICATING THE OFFICIAL DATE OF THE TERMINATION OF MARRIAGE. VACATE FLSC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/19/19 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55. RESPONDENT'S COUNSEL TO PREPARE JUDGMENT. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
November 26, 2019 | hearing | Mandatory Settlement Conference Original Type Mandatory Settlement Conference Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 01:30 PM Result Held Comment FAMILY LAW MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 25, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment FAMILY LAW MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: CHRISTINA SMITH COURT REPORTER KERRY MONTUORI;11516 BAILIFF: A KENNEDY - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN GOFFIGAN, BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN ATTORNEY JAMES J. KENNY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R. ABERNATHY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. **ATTORNEY ABERNATHY INDICATES HIS CLIENT WAS PRESENT EARLIER BUT HE EXCUSED HER** - PROCEEDINGS: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. COURT AND COUNSEL CONFER IN CHAMBERS OFF THE RECORD MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/26/19 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
November 25, 2019 | hearing | Miscellaneous Document Filed Comment PETITIONER'S MSC / TRIAL BRIEF FILED. | |
November 25, 2019 | hearing | Mandatory Settlement Conference Original Type Mandatory Settlement Conference Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment FAMILY LAW MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 22, 2019 | hearing | Trial Brief Filed Comment TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN | |
November 07, 2019 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITIONER'S FINAL DECL OF DISCLOSURES/ETC BY PERSONAL ON 11/04/19 AS TO Christopher R Abernathy, ESQ, FILED. | |
November 06, 2019 | hearing | Objection Filed Comment OBJECTION TO AND Motion to Strike PETNR'S FOAH FILED BY RESPONDENT | |
November 05, 2019 | hearing | Decl re: Service of Decl of Disclosure and I & E Filed Comment DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN FOR FINAL. | |
November 04, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN RE: PROPERTY CONTROL (061319) MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: AMBER BOUCHARD COURT REPORTER KERRY MONTUORI;11516 BAILIFF: F WILKERSON - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JAMES J. KENNY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R. ABERNATHY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN GOFFIGAN RESPONDENT BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD. ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED. MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
November 04, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: AMBER BOUCHARD COURT REPORTER KERRY MONTUORI;11516 BAILIFF: F WILKERSON - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JAMES J. KENNY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R. ABERNATHY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN GOFFIGAN RESPONDENT BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED. MATTER IS CONTESTED; COURT TRIAL REQUESTED. - HEARINGS: CONTINUED TO 11/25/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55 FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. FAMILY LAW SHORT CAUSE TRIAL SET FOR 12/19/19 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55 THE COURT DETERMINES THAT THE ISSUES TO BE RESOLVED AT THE TIME OF TRIAL ARE /IS ALL REMAINING ISSUES. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
November 04, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment STATUS CONFERENCE MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: AMBER BOUCHARD COURT REPORTER KERRY MONTUORI;11516 BAILIFF: F WILKERSON - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JAMES J. KENNY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R. ABERNATHY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN GOFFIGAN RESPONDENT BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (FL) OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: ON COURT'S OWN MOTION. MATTER COMPLETE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
November 04, 2019 | hearing | Request For Order Re: Original Type Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN RE: PROPERTY CONTROL (061319) | |
November 04, 2019 | hearing | Case Management Conference Original Type Case Management Conference Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 04, 2019 | hearing | Status Conference Original Type Status Conference Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment STATUS CONFERENCE | |
October 29, 2019 | hearing | Findings & Order After Hearing Filed Comment FINDING & ORDER AFTER HEARING; HEARING DATE: 09/10/19 FILED. | |
October 11, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN RE: PROPERTY CONTROL (061319) MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: JACQUELINE SEGOVIA COURT REPORTER KAREN DIGGS;7789 BAILIFF: F WILKERSON - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY KELLY PRICE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R. ABERNATHY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN GOFFIGAN, BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN - PROCEEDINGS: REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD. MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/04/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
October 11, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: JACQUELINE SEGOVIA COURT REPORTER KAREN DIGGS;7789 BAILIFF: F WILKERSON - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY KELLY PRICE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R. ABERNATHY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN GOFFIGAN, BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/04/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55. NOTICE WAIVED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
October 11, 2019 | hearing | Request For Order Re: Original Type Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN RE: PROPERTY CONTROL (061319) | |
October 11, 2019 | hearing | Case Management Conference Original Type Case Management Conference Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
October 09, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN RE: PROPERTY CONTROL (061319) MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: DANIELA VARGAS COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE BAILIFF: F WILKERSON - APPEARANCES: JAMES KENNY FOR JOHN GOFFIGAN NOT PRESENT ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R ABERNATHY FOR RESPONDENT MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN GOFFIGAN, BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN - PROCEEDINGS: REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD. MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/11/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55A. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
October 09, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: DANIELA VARGAS COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE BAILIFF: F WILKERSON - APPEARANCES: JAMES KENNY FOR JOHN GOFFIGAN NOT PRESENT ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R ABERNATHY FOR RESPONDENT MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN GOFFIGAN, BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/11/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55A. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
October 09, 2019 | hearing | Request For Order Re: Original Type Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN RE: PROPERTY CONTROL (061319) | |
October 09, 2019 | hearing | Case Management Conference Original Type Case Management Conference Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
September 27, 2019 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF PROPOSED FOAH BY MAIL ON 09/26/19 AS TO Christopher R Abernathy, FILED. | |
September 26, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN RE: PROPERTY CONTROL (061319) MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: AMBER BOUCHARD COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE BAILIFF: F WILKERSON - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY KELLY A. PRICE FOR PETITIONER MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE ATHY CHRISTOPHER R ABERN FOR BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN NOT PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN GOFFIGAN, BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN - PROCEEDINGS: REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD. MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/09/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
September 26, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: AMBER BOUCHARD COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE BAILIFF: F WILKERSON - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY KELLY A. PRICE FOR PETITIONER MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE ATHY CHRISTOPHER R ABERN FOR BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN NOT PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN GOFFIGAN, BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/09/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
September 26, 2019 | hearing | Request For Order Re: Original Type Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN RE: PROPERTY CONTROL (061319) | |
September 26, 2019 | hearing | Case Management Conference Original Type Case Management Conference Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
September 19, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN RE: PROPERTY CONTROL (061319) MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: AMBER BOUCHARD COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE BAILIFF: F WILKERSON - APPEARANCES: JAMES KENNY FOR JOHN GOFFIGAN NOT PRESENT ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R. ABERNATHY (OFFICE OF ELECTRONICALLY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN GOFFIGAN, BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN - PROCEEDINGS: REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD. MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/26/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55A. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
September 19, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: AMBER BOUCHARD COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE BAILIFF: F WILKERSON - APPEARANCES: JAMES KENNY FOR JOHN GOFFIGAN NOT PRESENT ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R. ABERNATHY (OFFICE OF ELECTRONICALLY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN GOFFIGAN, BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/26/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55A. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
September 19, 2019 | hearing | Request For Order Re: Original Type Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN RE: PROPERTY CONTROL (061319) | |
September 19, 2019 | hearing | Case Management Conference Original Type Case Management Conference Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
September 17, 2019 | hearing | Notice Filed re: Comment NOTICE AND ORDER TO ATTEND STATUS CONFERENCE FILED BY BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN. | |
September 10, 2019 | hearing | Stipulation for Appointment of Court Commissioner filed Comment STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED | |
September 10, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN RE: PROPERTY CONTROL (061319) MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: AMBER BOUCHARD COURT REPORTER KAREN DIGGS;7789 BAILIFF: F WILKERSON - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JAMES J. KENNY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R. ABERNATHY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN GOFFIGAN RESPONDENT BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD. STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/19/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55A. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
September 10, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: AMBER BOUCHARD COURT REPORTER KAREN DIGGS;7789 BAILIFF: F WILKERSON - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JAMES J. KENNY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R. ABERNATHY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN GOFFIGAN RESPONDENT BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED WITNESS -- RESPONDENT IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. - PURSUANT TO STIPULATION THE COURT APPOINTS DONALD MOWERY PURSUANT TO EC 730 TO APPRAISE THE FAMILY RESIDENCE. PETITIONER AGREES TO ADVANCE THE COST OF THE APPRAISAL, SUBJECT TO REALLOCATION BY THE COURT. - PETITIONER AGREES TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING THE DEBT ON THE MORTGAGE. - MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/19/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55A. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
September 10, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment MOTION RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY RESPONDENT BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: AMBER BOUCHARD COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE BAILIFF: F WILKERSON - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JAMES J. KENNY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R. ABERNATHY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN GOFFIGAN, BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN - PROCEEDINGS: OSC/MOTION HELD. OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: AT THE MOVING PARTY'S REQUEST. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
September 10, 2019 | hearing | Request For Order Re: Original Type Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN RE: PROPERTY CONTROL (061319) | |
September 10, 2019 | hearing | Case Management Conference Original Type Case Management Conference Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
September 10, 2019 | hearing | Motion Re: Original Type Motion Re: Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment MOTION RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY RESPONDENT BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN | |
September 09, 2019 | hearing | At-Issue Memorandum Filed Comment AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN | |
September 09, 2019 | hearing | Notice Imaged Comment NOTICE IMAGED | |
September 09, 2019 | hearing | Attorney Added for Defendant Comment ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN OF JOHN GOFFIGAN FOR BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN, ATTORNEY Christopher Abernathy ADDED. | |
September 09, 2019 | hearing | Decl re: Service of Decl of Disclosure and I & E Filed Comment DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN FOR PRELIM/FINAL. | |
September 09, 2019 | hearing | Income and Expense Declaration Filed Comment INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN | |
September 05, 2019 | hearing | Responsive Declaration re: RFO filed Comment RESPONSIVE DECLARATION FILED BY BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN RE:RFO FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN ON 06/13/11 | |
August 16, 2019 | hearing | Stipulation for Appointment of Court Commissioner filed Comment STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED | |
August 15, 2019 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN RE: PROPERTY CONTROL (061319) MICHAEL J GASSNER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: AMBER BOUCHARD COURT REPORTER KAREN DIGGS;7789 BAILIFF: F WILKERSON - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JAMES J. KENNY FOR PETITIONER MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R. ABERNATHY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN GOFFIGAN, BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN - PROCEEDINGS: REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD. STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED - THE COURT ORDERS: THIS CASE IS ORDERED INTO CASE MANAGEMENT PURSUANT TO FAMILY CODE SECTION 2450 AND 2451. THIS MATTER IS CONTINUED FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS SET FORTH BELOW. - ON COURT'S OWN MOTION, THE ISSUE OF WHY THE COURT SHOULDN'T BIFURCATE THE FAMILY HOME FOR PURPOSES OF JUDGMENT IS ADDED TO THE NEXT HEARING. - HEARINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/10/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55 CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/10/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
August 15, 2019 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel BY MAIL ON 08/14/19 AS TO JAMES J KENNY, FILED. | |
August 15, 2019 | hearing | Request For Order Re: Original Type Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN RE: PROPERTY CONTROL (061319) | |
August 08, 2019 | hearing | Motion Comment MOTION RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL SET FOR HEARING ON 09/10/19, FILED BY RESPONDENT BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN (IMAGED) 190808-1023-CK MMF/ 60.00 CRU/ 30.00 PAYMT 190808-1023-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 5364 | |
August 08, 2019 | hearing | Declaration Filed Comment DECLARATION OF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED FILED | |
June 27, 2019 | hearing | Decl re: Service of Decl of Disclosure and I & E Filed Comment DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN FOR PRELIM. | |
June 14, 2019 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF CONFORMED RFO BY MAIL ON 06/14/19 AS TO Christopher R Abernathy, FILED. | |
June 13, 2019 | hearing | Request for Order Filed re: Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN GOFFIGAN RE: PROPERTY CONTROL(061319). 190613-0110-CK MFL/ 60.00 CRU/ 30.00 PAYMT 190613-0110-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 2430 | |
May 31, 2018 | hearing | Response Filed to: Comment RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN OF JOHN GOFFIGAN BY BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN FILED. REPRESENTED BY Christopher Abernathy. 180531-0694-CK LFH/ 435.00 PAYMT 180531-0694-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 4648 | |
May 08, 2018 | hearing | Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON BEATRIZ LOPEZ GOFFIGAN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/19/18 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED. | |
April 17, 2018 | hearing | Certificate of Assignment Received Comment CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
April 17, 2018 | hearing | Family Law Summons Issued - Original Filed in Court File Comment FAMILY LAW Summons ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE. | |
April 17, 2018 | hearing | Case Assigned for All Purposes Comment CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S55 | |
April 17, 2018 | hearing | Petition and Party Information Entered (Family Law) Comment FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. 180417-0369-CK LFG/ 435.00 PAYMT 180417-0369-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 2252 |