Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ALI vs ALI
A Dissolution With Minor Children case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. Judge Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 02, 2020
Last Refreshed
March 21, 2024
Filing Location
Yolo County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Judge
Hon. Cortes, Sonia
Category
Dissolution With Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Request for Order: Modification
Date: Mar 20, 2024Request for Order: Modification
Date: Nov 07, 2023Trial: Long Cause
Date: Oct 09, 2023Motion
Date: Sep 21, 2023Settlement Conference
Date: Sep 18, 2023Motion
Date: Jun 27, 2023Review
Date: Jun 07, 2023Settlement Conference
Date: May 22, 2023Settlement Conference
Date: Apr 24, 2023Review
Date: Apr 24, 2023Review
Date: Apr 17, 2023Ex Parte
Date: Apr 06, 2023Settlement Conference
Date: Mar 20, 2023Trial: Short Cause
Date: Jan 30, 2023Trial Readiness Conference
Date: Jan 17, 2023Request for Order: Initial
Date: Nov 01, 2022Request for Order: Initial
Date: Sep 21, 2022Trial Setting Conference
Date: Jul 25, 2022Settlement Conference
Date: Feb 28, 2022Settlement Conference
Date: Jan 10, 2022Review
Date: Dec 14, 2021Trial Setting Conference
Date: Nov 02, 2021Request for Order: Initial
Date: Aug 25, 2021Trial Setting Conference
Date: Jul 27, 2021Request for Order: Initial
Date: Jul 06, 2021Review
Date: Apr 06, 2021Motion
Date: Apr 06, 2021Request for Order: Initial
Date: Mar 01, 2021Trial Setting Conference
Date: Feb 10, 2021FYI
Date: Jan 13, 2021FYI
Date: Nov 18, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
August 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Long Cause 6 hours on all reserved issues Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
July 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference
Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Modification Spousal Support Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance all parties |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY RESPONDENT |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED FAIZA SHAFQAT (ALI) ON 3/19/2024 WITH DECLARATION FILED ON 3/19/24 |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Modification Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion Joint Request to Continue |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Petitioner and Respondent |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED FAIZA SHAFQAT (ALI) WITH RESP'S FL150 ON 2/28/2024 BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED ANNE GLANZER W/ RESP'S FL150 ON 2/28/2024 BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY RESP |
|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Modification Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Continued by Court's Motion | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - all parties |
|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing SHORT FORM OAH; 12/19/2023 HRG |
|
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COMM. TAYLOR FOR REVIEW OF SHORT FORM OAH VIA TASKS & QUEUE |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Received SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Modification re: Temporary Spousal Support Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion to be heard in Department 4. |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Issue Spousal Support | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance by Muhammad Fahran Ali |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY PETITIONER |
|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record- WITHDRAWING IS ATTNY BRIAN PAKPOUR FOR THE PET FAIZA SHAFQAT | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED ANNE GLANZER ON BEHALF OF DCSS ON 11/17/2023 WITH NOTICE OF HEARING IN REGARDS TO SPOUSAL SUPPORT |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Modification SPOUSAL OR PARTNER SUPPORT |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED BRIAN PAKPOUR ON 11/17/2023 WITH NOTICE OF HEARING IN REGARDS TO SPOUSAL SUPPORT |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY RESPONDENT |
|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COMM. TAYLOR FOR REVIEW OF OAH VIA TASKS & QUEUE |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Received OAH |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Modification Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED YOLO COUNTY DCSS BY MAIL WITH PETITIONER'S RESPONSIVE DECL TO REQ FOR ORDER & PETITIONER'S DECL REGARDING PAYMENT HISTORY ON 10/26/2023 |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Atty Lusk; Respondent; Atty Pakpour; Faiza Shafqat |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED ANNE GLANZER ON BEHALF OF DCSS AGENCY WITH DECLARATION OF RESPONDENT ON THE CHILD SUPPORT, SPOUSAL SUPPORT AND ARREARS ON 11-2-2023 |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration RESPONDENT MUHAMMAH FARHAN ALI'S DECLARATION ON CHILD & SPOUSAL SUPPORT AND ARREARS |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED BRIAN PAKPOUR ON BEHALF OF FAIZA ALI WITH DECLARATION OF RESPONDENT ON THE CHILD SUPPORT, SPOUSAL SUPPORT AND ARREARS ON 11-2-2023 |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing SHORT FORM OAH; 10/24/23 HRG |
|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Received SHORT FORM OAH SUBMITTED BY DCSS |
|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COMM. TAYLOR FOR REVIEW OF SHORT FORM OAH VIA TASKS & QUEUE |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY ATTNY FOR PET FAIZA ALI Declaration Regarding Payment History |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on MUHAMMAD FARHAN ALI BY MAIL ON 10/26/23 WITH PET RESPONSIVE DEC + DEC RE PAYMENT HISTORY | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on DCSS BY MAIL ON 10/26/23 WITH PET RESPONSIVE DEC + DEC RE PAYMENT HISTORY | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration FILED BY ATTNY FOR PET FAIZA ALI Responsive Declaration |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Modification RESPONDENT'S RE: CHILD SUPPORT AND DETERMINATION OF ARREARS FOR UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL AND EXTRACURRICULAR ACTIVITIES Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion Joint |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance All appearances |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY FAIZA ALI |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED MUHAMMAD FARHAN ALI WITH PETITIONER'S ANSWER AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION ON 10/18/23 BY MAIL |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED YOLO COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES WITH PETITIONER'S ANSWER, AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION ON 10/8/23 BY MAIL |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint or Sup Complaint Re: Parental Obligation | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Assigned, Judge |
|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Further Court Trial Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Assigned, Judge |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Long Cause 4 AFTERNOONS Judge: Assigned, Judge |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Assigned, Judge |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To CAL SHELF- DEPT. 4 WITH EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER |
|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY MUHAMMAD FARHAN ALI - RESPONDENT MUHAMMAD FARHAN ASLIS DECLARATION ON TRIAL FOR CHILD CUSTODY |
|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service EMAIL SERVED DEC OF RESP AND SWORN STATEMENTS TO BRIAN PAKPOUR ON BEHALF OF FAIZA ALI ON 10/4/23 |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed FOR ELIZABETH LOPEZ; POS |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed FOR SHAFQAT ALI; POS |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed FOR SHUGUFTA SHABIR; POS |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed FOR ELIZABETH LOPEZ; POS INCOMPLETE |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed FOR SHAFQAT ALI; POS INCOMPLETE |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed FOR SHUGUFTA SHABIR; POS INCOMPLETE |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED BRIAN PAKPOUR, ESQ. ON BEHALF OF FAIZA ALI WITH EXHIBITS WITH BRIEFS AND WITNESS LIST FOR THE CHILD CUSTODY TRIAL |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DEPARTMENT 4 FOR HRG ON 10/09/23 AT 1:30PM WITH RESPONDENT'S EXHIBITS |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed FILED BY RESPONDENT |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Received RESPONDENT'S EXHIBITS |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt AS TO BRIAN PAKPOUR, ESQ. |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE PETRE FOR REVIEW OF EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT ORDER RE: SPOUSAL/PARTNER SUPPORT |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Motion MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Settlement Conference Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance All parties |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration TO REQ FOR ORDER; FILED BY DCSS |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration RESPONDENT MUHAMMAD FARHAN ALI'S DECLARATION ON SETTLEMTN CONF. ON CHILD CUSTODY |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED BRIAN PAKPOUR WITH DECLARATION OF RESPONDENT FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HRG ON CHILD CUSTODY ON 9/14/2023 |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement FILED BY ATTNY FOR PET FAIZA ALI Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CONTINUANCE |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED NANCY HANG ON 9-11-23 WITH NOTICE OF HEARNG FOR CHANGE IN CHILD SUPPORT ORDER AND DETERMINATION OF ARREARS OF UNREIMBURSED EXTRA CURRICULAR ACTIVITIES AND MEDICAL EXPENSES, INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED BRIAN PAKPOUR ON 9-11-23 WITH NOTICE OF HEARNG FOR CHANGE IN CHILD SUPPORT ORDER AND DETERMINATION OF ARREARS OF UNREIMBURSED EXTRA CURRICULAR ACTIVITIES AND MEDICAL EXPENSES, INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY RESPONDENT |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Modification RESPONDENT'S REQUEST RE: CHILD SUPPORT AND DETERMINATION OF ARREARS FOR UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL AND EXTRACURRICULAR ACTIVITIES |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Issue: Child Support AND DETERMINATION OF ARREARS FOR UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL AND EXTRACURRICULAR ACTIVITIES |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Supplemental Dept of Child Support Services(DCSS) Complaint 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED FAIZA SHAFQAT WITH NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNCIL ON 8/30/2023 |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To ORDER TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL SENT TO CAL SHELF UNTIL 9/21/23 HRG |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion - $60 Fee NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; FILED BY BRIAN PAKPOUR, ESQ. |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DCSS- EX PARTE APPLICATION AND ORDER TO ISSUE AN EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT ORDER |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To FOR REVIEW OF APPLICATION AND ORDER RE: EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT FOR SPOUSAL/PARTNER SUPPORT |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT ORDER FOR SPOUSAL OR PARTNER SUPPORT |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application - No Fee EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ISSUE AN EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT ORDER |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Lodged Documents EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT ORDER FOR SPOUSAL OR PARTNER SUPPORT |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order - No Fee SIGNED 8/9/23 |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COMM. TAYLOR FOR REVIEW OF STIP & ORDER VIA TASKS & QUEUE |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Received STIP & ORDER SUBMITTED BY DCSS |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY ATTNY FOR PET FAIZA SHAFQAT- NO SIGNATURE ON PG 3 -Income & Expense Declaration |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE PETRE |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter Received LETTER to court regarding FOAH submission |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Motion TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY DEFENDANT |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Review CCRC Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance MUHAMMAD ALI |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney BRIAN PAKPOUR IN PLACE OF ROBERT MCCANN FOR THE PET FAIZA SHAFQAT ALI |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Report Received CCRC Report |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Settlement Conference Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance ALL PARTIES |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ESERVED FAIZA ALI, faiza_manoor@yahoo.com, WITH NOTICE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL, DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION, PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED ON 05/22/2023 |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration IN SUPPORT OF ATTY FOR THE PLTFF'S MTN TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL- CIVIL |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MTN AND MTN TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ESERVED MUHAMMAD ALI, farhan.ali1286@gmail.com, WITH NOTICE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL, DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION, PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED ON 05/22/2023 |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING 04/24/2023 |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Settlement Conference Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Review
Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion PETITIONER |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance petitioner |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance ALL PARTIES |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Review REVIEW OF INVESTIGATION Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance ALL PARTIES |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Continued by Party's Motion | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Ex Parte Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Granted EXPARTE GRANTED |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order temporary emergency order |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance ALL PARTIES EXCEPT DAD |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To CAL SHELF UNTIL 4/6/2023 HRG |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure FILED BY RESPONDENT |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents TEMP EX PARTE ORDER |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Modification RESPONDENT'S RFO RE: CHILD CUSTODY / VISITATION |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY RESPONDENT |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Lodged Documents TEMP EX PARTE ORDER |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Issue: Child Custody | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Settlement Conference Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance ALL PARTIES |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing SIGNED 2/8/2023; DCSS |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COMM. TAYLOR FOR REVIEW OF OAH |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing SHORT FORM OAH; SIGNED 1/30/23 |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Scanned & Verified |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibit Receipt | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial: Short Cause 1 DAY Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance DCSS Michael Lusk Petitioner Present with Atty McCann Respondent Present in Pro Per |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED ROBERT MCCANN ON BEHALF OF FAIZA ALI ON 1/26/23 WITH SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF THE RESPONDENT MUHAMMAD FARHAN ALI WITH EXHIBITS |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION WITH EXHIBITS TO COMMISSIONER FOR 1/30/23 HRG AT 1:30 IN DEPT. 12 |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents PETITIONER FILED EXHIBIT LIST WITH EXHIBITS ATTACHED: RETURNED TO PARTY: EXHIBITS ARE TO BE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT IN PAPER FORM PER LOCAL RULES OF COURT |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COMM. TAYLOR FOR REVIEW OF SHORT FORM OAH |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION FILED BY RESPONDENT MUHAMMAD FARHAN ALI | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed PETITIONER'S WITNESS LIST |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED ROBERT MCCANN ON 1/24/23 WITH FILED FL-150; FILED DECLARATION OF MUHAMMAD FARHAN ALI, RESPONDENTM IN SUPPORT OF RECALCULATION OF CHILD AND SPOUSAL SUPPORT FROM AUGUST 1ST, 2022; TAXES 2021/22, PAYSTUBS-2MONTHS, W-2/1099 |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INCOME AND EXPENSE DCL FILED BY ATTY FOR PETITIONER |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE ON 01/24/23 TO MUHAMMAD FARNAN ALI: INCOME AND EXPENSE DCL; TRIAL BRIEF, WITNESS LIST, EXHIBIT LIST |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed PETITIONER'S TRIAL BRIEF RE; CHILD SUPPORT, SPOUSAL SUPPORT: HRG 01/30/2023 |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY MUHAMMAD FARHAN ALI |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED RESPONDENT BY MAIL WITH PETITIONER'S UNFILED INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION ON 1/19/23 |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial Readiness Conference Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance ALL PARTIES |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial Setting Conference Judge: Assigned, Judge |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance ALL PARTIES |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Short Cause
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial Readiness Conference Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance BY ALL PARTIES AND ATTORNEY |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing HEARING ON 11/1/2022 |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COMM TAYLOR FOR REVIEW ON ORDER AFTER HEARING |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Initial Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance ALL APPEARANCES |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial
Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY RESPONDENT |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order *Request for Order: Initial CHILD/SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTY FEES Judge: Williams, Peter M. |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial CHILD SUPPORT Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Continued by Court's Motion | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration TO REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY YOLO DCSS |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Regarding Payment of Support (Governmental) YOLO DCSS ENTERING FOR ALL SUPPORT PURPOSES |
|
July 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents THIRD PARTY JOINDER: THIS FILING IS BEING RETURNED BECAUSE ALL REQUIRED FILINGS MUST BE SUBMITTED AT THE TIME OF FILING. COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS SHOULD BE LODGED WITH THE COURT FOR HEARING DATE. ALSO ALL FILINGS SHOULD HAVE THEIR OWN FILING CODE AND FILINGS SHOULD BE SCANNED INTO THOSE CODES. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT. |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Issue: Child Support | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order *Trial Setting Conference Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | *Request for Order - Initial | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney PRO PER IN PLACE OF ALI YOUSEFI ESQ FOR RESP MUHAMMAD FARHAN ALI |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FOR HEARING ON 5/23/22 |
|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter Received BY RESP |
|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE CORTES - FOAH FOR 5/23/22 |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference Further Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing OF 02/28/2022 |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter Received FROM ALI YOUSEFI, ESQ |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE CORTES FOR REVIEW ON FOAH |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference and TSC Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Settlement Conference Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Statement PET'S AMENDED Statement OF ISSUES, CONTENTIONS AND PROPOSED DISPOSITION OF THE CARE |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Notice MUHAMMAD FARHAN ALI, ALI YOUSEFI AND KARL SIGANPORIA ATTORNEY FOR RESPONDENT - THROUGHOUT THE CASE |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service SERVED NROBERT MCCANN W/ Settlement Conference statement (FL-150, FL-160) on 1/5/2022 | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration (for settlement conference) | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Property Declaration (for settlement conference) BY RESP | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Review CCRC Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Supplemental Declaration OF MUHAMMAD FARHAN ALI |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONIC SERVICE, SERVED ROBERT MCCANN WITH SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MUHAMMAD FARHAN ALI ON 12/11/21 |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report Received CCRC Report |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial Setting Conference Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation Referred to Child Custody Recommending Counseling with Milton Kalish |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | *Referral to Family Court Services Mediation | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Initial Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filed ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION FILED BY PETITIONER FAIZA ALI |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filed ANSWER TO FORM INTERROGATORIES GENERAL SET ONE FILED BY PETITIONER FAIZA ALI |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED ALI YOUSEFI WITH ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY PETITIONER FAIZA ALI AND ANSWER TO FORM INTERROGATORIES GENERAL SET ONE BY PETITIONER FAIZA ALI ON 7/30/2021 |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED ROBERT MCCAN WITH FILED FL-300, MEMORANDUM OF POINYS AND AUTHORITIES AND PROPOSED ORDER ON 7/29/2021 |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED ROBERT MCCAN WITH FILED FL-300, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND PROPOSED ORDER MAILED ON 7/29/2021 |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial Setting Conference 3111 EVAL REV Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodged Documents PROPOSED ORDER |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Initial Request for Order Establishing Admissions and for Sanctions |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Ali Yousefi in Support of RFO | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents PROPOSED ORDER |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Order Compelling filed July 6, 2021 |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Initial MOTION TO COMPEL Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Compelling Petitioner to Respond to Special Interrogatories, and Form Interrogatories - Family Law (Set One); and Awarding Sanctions | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PETITIONER TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, AND FORM INTERROGATORIES - FAMILY LAW (SET ONE); AND SANCTIONS |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents WE ARE RETURNING THIS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: THE $30 COURT REPORTER FEE IS MISSING. PLEASE RESUBMIT WITH THIS REQUIRED FEE WHICH IS UNDER "OPTIONAL SERVICES." THANK YOU. |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodged Documents [PROPOSED] ORDER COMPELLING PETITION TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, AND FORM INTERROGATORIES - FAMILY LAW (SET ONE); AND AWARDING SANCTIONS |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Initial MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, FORM INTERROGATORIES, AND FOR SANCTIONS, FILED BY RESP |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED ROBERT MCCANN WITH FILED FL-300, DECL OF ALI YOUSEFI, MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, AND PROPOSED ORDER ON 6/2/2021 BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF ALI YOUSEFI, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PETITIONER TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, AND FORM INTERROGATORIES - FAMILY LAW (SET ONE); AND SANCTIONS |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents [PROPOSED] ORDER COMPELLING PETITION TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, AND FORM INTERROGATORIES - FAMILY LAW (SET ONE); AND AWARDING SANCTIONS |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents THE FOAH THAT IS ATTACHED IS FOR CASE FL2020-1013 BUT YOUR ORDER APPOINTING CHILD CUSTODY EVALUATOR IS FOR FL2020-1006 |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Review TSC /STATUS OF 3111 EVALUATION Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Motion MOTION FOR JOINDER Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Status-Only Judgment MARTIAL STATUS ENDS: MARCH 3, 2021 |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To PROPOSED JUDGMENT SENT TO JUDGE WITH MEMO |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To SUMMONS SENT TO CAL SHELF |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution and Notice of Entry of Judgment (FL-180 with attached FL-347) Judgment of Dissolution (status only) |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To FLF |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution and Notice of Entry of Judgment FL-190 Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND DECLARATARION FOR JOINDER |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order *Request for Order: Initial Bifurcation / TSC / 3111 eval status Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial Setting Conference TSC/3111 STATUS/COUNSELING REV Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To LODGED DOCS SENT TO DEPT 4 |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodged Documents NOTICE OF MOTION |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodged Documents SUMMONS |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents SUMMONS |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents NOTICE OF MOTION |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Proof of Electronic Service (FILED Request for Order - Initial - Bifurcation of Status (FL-300 with FL-315 attachment)) |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Initial Request for Order - Initial - Bifurcation of Status (FL-300 with FL-315 attachment) |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
FYI
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MUHAMMAD FARRAN ALI | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL- SERVED PET SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION ON 1/7/2021 | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Re:Notice; Deliveroy of Emergency Request; filed by respondent (filed in parties closed dv case fl20-1013) |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Modification filed by resp re:ch cust/visit - filed in parties closed dv case fl20-1013. |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration FILED BY PETITIONER IN REL CASE FL20-1013 (PARTIES CLOSED DV CASE) |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Report Confidential CCRC Report |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation REFERRED TO CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING WITH MILTON KALISH |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order FYI Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY PET |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY RESP |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Orientation Filed BY MUHAMMAD FARHAN ALI |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure RESPS PRELIMINARY |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents EX PARTE PAPERWORK - PER LOCAL RULE 9 |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee RESPONSE-MARRIAGE DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Decl Under Uniform Child Custody Juris & Enf Act (UCCJEA) DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL SERVED FAIZA ALI W/ FL150 AND FL-105 ON 9/22/2020 | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED MUHAMMAD FARHAN ALI WITH FL-100 PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, FL-105, GC-120 DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILDAND JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT ACT ON 9-2-2020 |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney ROBERT MCCANN IN PLACE OF PRO PER FOR PETITIONER |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution/Legal Sep/Nullity. | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE CORTES |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) |