Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rosalba Hernandez, Ana Hernandez, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by In Pro Per, against Phyllis A Dsilva, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 17, 2022 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims
Date: February 15, 2023Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims
Date: December 14, 2022Certificate of Mailing
Date: April 17, 2023Notice of Resetting of Small Claims Hearing
Date: February 15, 2023Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims
Date: April 17, 2023Notice of Resetting of Small Claims Hearing
Date: December 14, 2022Affidavit re: Of Unsuccessful Service
Date: November 01, 2022Notice of Department Assignment
Date: October 17, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.