Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Campos De Bravo, Graciela, Jim Ressler Trucking, Inc., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Jim Ressler Trucking, Inc., Redthunder, Caedmon, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Auto Tort |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed by Jim Ressler Trucking, Inc. against Ana M. Bravo Campos, Julio Miranda Sr., Marco Antonio Sanchez, and ROES 1 through 15. The cross-complainant is suing the cross-defendants. The document provides informati...
Order Continuing Case Management Conference filed
Date: March 09, 2021Summons Cross Complaint issued and filed.
Date: December 09, 2020Cross-Complaint of Jim Ressler Trucking, Inc. filed by Jim Ressler Trucking, Inc..
Date: December 09, 2020Answer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Jim Ressler Trucking, Inc..
Date: December 09, 2020Summons issued and filed.
Date: December 17, 2020Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 03/08/2022 08:45 AM .
Date: March 08, 2022Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Campos De Bravo, Graciela.
Date: October 20, 2021Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 06/29/2021 08:45 AM .
Date: June 29, 2021Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: November 09, 2020Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Campos De Bravo, Graciela.
Date: October 20, 2021Summons issued and filed.
Date: December 17, 2020Summons Cross Complaint issued and filed.
Date: December 09, 2020Cross-Complaint of Jim Ressler Trucking, Inc. filed by Jim Ressler Trucking, Inc..
Date: December 09, 2020Answer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Jim Ressler Trucking, Inc..
Date: December 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 07/14/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: CMC: Request for Dismissal held on March 8, 2022.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 03/08/2022 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Vacated
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Conditional Settlement.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal As to Plaintiff's Complaint only., set for 03/08/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
CM200 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Campos De Bravo, Graciela. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
CM200 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Campos De Bravo, Graciela. Notice of Settlement - Conditional Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Payment received by Ana Bravo Campos in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 675118.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED RECORD SEALED Demand for Jury Trial filed by Bravo Campos, Ana M.; Miranda, Julio SR; Sanchez, Marco Antonio. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.