Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Guardianship of Prabhjot Singh
On October 25, 2023 a probate guardianship person only case was filed in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. Judge Carter Holly presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 25, 2023
Last Refreshed
May 02, 2024
Filing Location
San Joaquin County, CA
Category
Probate Guardianship Person Only
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Status
Active
Parties
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Confidential Guardian Screening Form GC-212 filed by Singh, Jatanjit; Kaur, Sandip. | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Probate Note published. | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Appointment of Guardian , set for 05/02/2024 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Sabrina Schneweis-Coe in Department 11A. | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing re: Appointment of Guardian held on February 22, 2024. | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Appointment of Guardian held on 02/22/2024 08:30 AM . | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Consent of Proposed Guardian, Nomination of Guardian and Consent of Appointment of Guardian GC-211 filed by Kaur, Sandip; Singh, Jatanjit. | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing - Guardianship or Conservatorship GC-020 filed by Kaur, Sandip; Singh, Jatanjit. | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Request to Dispense with Notice filed by Kaur, Sandip; Singh, Jatanjit. | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Singh, Jatanjit; Kaur, Sandip. | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing - Guardianship or Conservatorship GC-020 filed by Kaur, Sandip; Singh, Jatanjit. | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Probate Note published. | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Sabrina Schneweis-Coe Assigned. BATCH | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Guardianship Next Steps filed | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Appointment of Guardian , set for 02/22/2024 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 11A. | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Case initiated. | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Confidential Guardian Screening Form GC-212 filed by Kaur, Sandip; Singh, Jatanjit. | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received by James Osborne in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 877803. | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Consent of Proposed Guardian, Nomination of Guardian, and Consent to Appointment of Guardian GC-211 filed by Kaur, Sandip; Singh, Jatanjit. | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney, James Osborne, retained for Jatanjit Singh . | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) GC-120 filed by Kaur, Sandip; Singh, Jatanjit. | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Duties of Guardian filed by GC-248 Kaur, Sandip; Singh, Jatanjit. | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Guardian of The Person GC-210(P) filed by Kaur, Sandip; Singh, Jatanjit. | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney, James Osborne, retained for Sandip Kaur . |