Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CF-2019-1777
A case was filed in the jurisdiction of Tulsa County, OK. Judge James W. Keeley presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 11, 2019
Last Refreshed
July 13, 2023
Filing Location
Tulsa County, OK
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
David Guten;Status
Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Documents
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION
Date: Aug 18, 2020WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD PROSEQUENDUM
Date: Mar 04, 2020APPLICATION - WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD PROSEQUENDUM
Date: Mar 04, 2020ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF DISCOVERY
Date: Feb 27, 2020WITNESS FEES PAID BY DISTRICT ATTORNEY ON 10-1-19
Date: Nov 19, 2019NOTICE OF FILING
Date: Oct 24, 2019COURT REPORTERS CERTIFICATE
Date: Oct 03, 2019ORDER APPOINTING CONFLICT DEFENDER
Date: Aug 05, 2019WITNESS FEES PAID BY DISTRICT ATTORNEY ON 6-3-19
Date: Jul 30, 2019RETURN RELEASE
Date: Jul 01, 2019RETURN RELEASE
Date: Jun 21, 2019ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF DISCOVERY
Date: Jun 11, 2019ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF DISCOVERY
Date: Jun 05, 2019ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF DISCOVERY
Date: May 07, 2019ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL
Date: May 03, 2019MOTION OR APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW
Date: May 03, 2019RETURN COMMITMENT
Date: Apr 15, 2019PAUPERS AFFIDAVIT
Date: Apr 12, 2019TULSA COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE INSPECTION REQUEST
Date: Apr 11, 2019DISTRICT ATTORNEY INSPECTION NOTIFICATION
Date: Apr 11, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION | |
August 07, 2020 | hearing | JUDGE TRACY PRIDDY. DEFENDANT PRESENT, NOT IN CUSTODY, REPRESENTED BY FRED DEMIER. STATE REPRESENTED BY RANDALL YOUNG. CASE CALLED FOR HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. COURT SIGNS AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. CASE DISMISSED COST TO STATE DUE TO LACK OF JURISDICTION. BOND EXONERATED. | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGE TRACY PRIDDY. DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT, IN THE CUSTODY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, REPRESENTED BY FRED DEMIER. STATE REPRESENTED BY WRILEY ANDERSON. CASE CALLED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. STATUS CONFERENCE PASSED TO 8-7-2020 AT 9:30AM IN ROOM 413. BOND TO REMAIN. | |
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGE TRACY PRIDDY. PURSUANT TO SCAD 2020-29 EMERGENCY, STATUS CONFERENCE SET ON 5-27-2020 PASSED TO 7-31-2020 AT 9:30AM IN ROOM 413. DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT, BENCH WARRANT UNDER ADVISEMENT. | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGE TRACY PRIDDY. PURSUANT TO SCAD 2020-29 EMERGENCY, STATUS CONFERENCE SET ON 4-20-2020 PASSED TO 5-27-2020 AT 1:30PM IN ROOM 413. DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT, BENCH WARRANT UNDER ADVISEMENT. | |
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGE TRACY PRIDDY. JURY TRIAL ISSUE SET ON 3-30-2020 STRICKEN BY ORDER OF THE COURT. STATUS CONFERENCE SET ON 4-20-2020 AT 9:30AM IN ROOM 413. | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD PROSEQUENDUM | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | APPLICATION - WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD PROSEQUENDUM | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGE TRACY PRIDDY. COURT SIGNS WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD PROSEQUENDUM. | |
February 28, 2020 | hearing | JUDGE TRACY PRIDDY. DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT, IN CUSTODY, REPRESENTED BY FRED DEMIER. STATE REPRESENTED BY WRILEY ANDERSON. CASE CALLED FOR ALLEN DISCOVERY HEARING. BOTH PARTIES REQUESTED DISCLOSURE & ANNOUNCE COMPLETE. | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF DISCOVERY | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | WITNESS FEES PAID BY DISTRICT ATTORNEY ON 10-1-19 | |
October 24, 2019 | hearing | ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT & 2 COPIES OF PRELIMINARY HEARING ON THE 19TH DAY OF JUNE, 2019. BOTH COPIES OF DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE. | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTER'S CERTIFICATE | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND | |
August 12, 2019 | hearing | JUDGE TRACY PRIDDY. DEFENDANT PRESENT, IN CUSTODY, REPRESENTED BY FRED DEMIER. STATE REPRESENTED BY TODD CHESBRO. CASE CALLED FOR DISTRICT COURT ARRAIGNMENT. DISTRICT COURT ARRAIGNMENT HELD. DEFENDANT STANDS MUTE TO THE INFORMATION AND REQUESTS JURY TRIAL. COURT ENTERS A PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ON THE DEFENDANT'S BEHALF. JURY TRIAL SET FOR 3-30-2020 AT 1:30PM IN ROOM 413. ALLEN DISCOVERY HEARING SET TO 2-28-2020 AT 9:30AM IN ROOM 413. DEFENDANT RECOGNIZED BACK. BOND TO REMAIN. | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING CONFLICT DEFENDER | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGE James Keeley; COURT SIGNS ORDER APPOINTING FRED DEMIER AS CONFLICT COUNSEL. PUBLIC DEFENDER ALLOWED TO WITHDRAW | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | WITNESS FEES PAID BY DISTRICT ATTORNEY ON 6-3-19 | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGE TRACY PRIDDY. DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT, IN CUSTODY, REPRESENTED BY FRED DEMIER. STATE REPRESENTED BY TODD CHESBRO. CASE CALLED FOR DISTRICT COURT ARRAIGNMENT. DISTRICT COURT ARRAIGNMENT PASSED TO 8-12-2019 AT 9:30AM IN ROOM 413. BOND TO REMAIN. | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN RELEASE | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGE TRACY PRIDDY. DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT, IN CUSTODY, REPRESENTED BY FRED DEMIER. STATE REPRESENTED BY TODD CHESBRO. CASE CALLED FOR DISTRICT COURT ARRAIGNMENT. DISTRICT COURT ARRAIGNMENT PASSED TO 7-29-2019 AT 9:30AM IN ROOM 413. BOND TO REMAIN. | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN RELEASE | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGE James Keeley: DEFENDANT PRESENT AND REPRESENTED BY ALEX BRAMLETT. STATE REPRESENTED BY JAMES ASBILL FOR TODD CHESBRO. STATE ANNOUNCES DISMISSAL. DISMISSED BY COURT, COST TO STATE, PENDING FURTHER INVESTIGATION. BOND EXONERATED. RELEASE ISSUED TO JAIL | |
June 19, 2019 | hearing | JUDGE James Keeley: DEFENDANT PRESENT, IN CUSTODY AND REPRESENTED BY FRED DEMIER. STATE REPRESENTED BY TOOD CHESBRO. COURT REPORTER: JENNIFER GOLEMBOSKI. CASE CALLED FOR PRELIMINARY HEARING. ONE (1) WITNESS SWORN. DEMURRER OVERRULED. 2ND PAGE APPROVED. DEFENDANT IS BOUND OVER TO DISTRICT COURT ON 6-24-19 AT 9:30 AM ROOM 413 BEFORE JUDGE TRACY PRIDDY. BOND TO REMAIN; DEFENDANT REMANDED TO CUSTODY. | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTER FEE AT TRIAL (JURY/NON-JURY/PRELIMINARY) | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF DISCOVERY | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF DISCOVERY | |
May 29, 2019 | hearing | JUDGE James Keeley: DEFENDANT PRESENT, IN CUSTODY AND REPRESENTED BY FRED DEMIER (NOT PRESENT - MEDICAL). PUBLIC DEFENDER ALLOWED TO WITHDRAW. STATE REPRESENTED BY JAMES ASBILL. PRELIMINARY HEARING ISSUE PASSED BY DEFENSE TO 6-19-19 AT 9:00 AM ROOM 347. BOND TO REMAIN; DEFENDANT REMANDED TO CUSTODY. | |
May 29, 2019 | hearing | JUDGE James Keeley: DEFENDANT PRESENT, IN CUSTODY AND REPRESENTED BY ALEX BRAMLETT. STATE REPRESENTED BY JAMES ASBILL. PRELIMINARY HEARING ISSUE PASSED BY STATE TO 6-19-19 AT 9:00 AM ROOM 347 OVER DEFENSE OBJECTION. BOND TO REMAIN; DEFENDANT REMANDED TO CUSTODY. | |
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF DISCOVERY | |
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL | |
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION OR APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW | |
May 01, 2019 | hearing | JUDGE ANTHONY MILLER: DEFENDANT PRESENT, IN CUSTODY AND REPRESENTED BY ALEX BRAMLETT. STATE REPRESENTED BY TODD CHESBRO. PRELIMINARY HEARING PASSED TO 5-29-19 AT 9:00 AM ROOM 347 . BOND TO REMAIN; DEFENDANT REMANDED TO CUSTODY . | |
May 01, 2019 | hearing | JUDGE James Keeley: DEFENDANT PRESENT, IN CUSTODY AND REPRESENTED BY PUBLIC DEFENDER (ALLOWED TO WITHDRAW). STATE REPRESENTED BY TODD CHESBRO. PRELIMINARY HEARING PASSED TO 5-29-19 AT 9:00 AM ROOM 347. BOND TO REMAIN; DEFENDANT REMANDED TO CUSTODY . | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN COMMITMENT | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | PAUPER'S AFFIDAVIT | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | TULSA COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE INSPECTION REQUEST | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | DISTRICT ATTORNEY INSPECTION NOTIFICATION | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT JUSTIN WAYNE LOCUST WAS CHARGED WITH COUNT #1, ROBBERY WITH A FIREARM IN VIOLATION OF 21 O.S. 801 | |
April 11, 2019 | hearing | JUDGE GUTEN: DEFENDANT PRESENT, IN CUSTODY AND PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD. ARRAIGNMENT HELD. DEFENDANT WAIVES READING OF THE INFORMATION AND FURTHER TIME TO PLEAD. DEFENDANT ENTERS A PLEA OF NOT GUILTY. PRELIMINARY HEARING SET FOR 5-1-19 @ 9AM IN ROOM 347. BOND $100,000. DEFENDANT REMANDED TO CUSTODY. | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGE David Guten: CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO A-DOCKET PER CF-19-1777. | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT JAMES TYLER GARBEY WAS CHARGED WITH COUNT #1, ROBBERY WITH A FIREARM IN VIOLATION OF 21 O.S. 801 | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE CF DOCKET B TO THIS CASE. | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL FELONY INITIAL FILING. |