Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PEREZ, JOSE V FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT CO
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL. Judge Ronald V. Alvarez presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 30, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT FILED BY PLTS |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
DB PURSUANT TO MEDIATED SETTLE DBM - PURSUANT TO MEDIATED SETTLE |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION TO ISSUANCE (F/B DFT) OF NON OBJECTION TO ISSUANCE (F/B DFT) |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COMPULSORY PHYSICAL EXAMINATIONS FILED BY DFT OF COMPULSORY PHYSICAL EXAMINATIONS FILED BY DFT |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY PLTS |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS TO DEFENDANT FILED BY PLTS |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION 6/27/19 10-12PM Ronald Alvarez MEDIATOR |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFENDANT FILED BY PLTS |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT LIST |
|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST DEFENDANT, FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY'S WITNESS & EXHIBIT LIST |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT FPL'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL AND DESIGNATION FOR E-SERVICE - F/B ATTY KEVIN DONALDSON OBO DFT |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION JOSE PEREZ - WEDNESDAY MAY 15, 2019 @ 10:00 AM & BELINDA BARTOLON WEDNESDAY MAY 15, 2019 @ 1:00 PM - F/B DFT |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT |
|
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION GEORGE JACKSON 10:00:00 AM |
|
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 03/12/2019 | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO: PLT'S REQUEST FOR COPIES (F/B DFT) PLT'S REQUEST FOR COPIES (F/B DFT) |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 03/12/2019 08:45:00 AM | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS FILED BY PLTS |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS (A SPANISH TRANSLATOR WILL BE PROVIDED) JOSE PEREZ 03/19/2019 10:00:00 AM | |
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DFT PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DFT |
|
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO: PLTF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES- F/B DEFT PLTF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES- F/B DEFT |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS JOSE PEREZ 02/21/2019 10:00:00 AM BELINDA BARTOLON 02/21/2019 01:00:00 PM | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION GEORGE JACKSON 10:00:00 AM |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO: PLTF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES- F/B DEFT PLTF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES- F/B DEFT |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION TO ISSUANCE OF FRCP 1.351 SUBPOENAS (F/B DFT) OF NON OBJECTION TO ISSUANCE OF FRCP 1.351 SUBPOENAS (F/B DFT) |
|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO: TO PLTFS' REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT TO PLTFS' REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO: PLTS' REQUEST FOR COPIES. F/B DFT PLTS' REQUEST FOR COPIES. F/B DFT |
|
November 12, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION 11/13/18 | |
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL -HAFELE- DTD 11/8/18: 7/29/19 THRU 10/4/19. APPEAR 7/19/19 AT 9AM IN CTRM 10D. |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION TO ISSUANCE OF FLA R CIV P 1.351 SUBPOENAS F/B DFT OF NON OBJECTION TO ISSUANCE OF FLA R CIV P 1.351 SUBPOENAS F/B DFT |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL F/B PLTS *UP 10/3/18* |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION GEORGE JACKSON 11-13 AT 11AM FILED BY PLT |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST INTERROGATORIES |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT FIT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST INTERROGATORIES |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S, JOSE PEREZ, RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, BELINDA BARTOLON |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, JOSE PEREZ |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S, BELINDA BARTOLON, RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS DEFENDANT FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B DFT FPL |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION NOTICE OF APPEARANCE F/B ATTY TANYA LAWSON OBO DFT FPL |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 2779718 $411.00 2779718 Fully Paid |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE F/B PLT |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO K&K TRANSPORTATION LLC F/B PLT |