Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the Matter of the Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim by Anamely Angel
A Compromise Of Minor's Claim case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV. Judge Adair, Valerie presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 22, 2017
Last Refreshed
November 27, 2020
Filing Location
Clark County, NV
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Richard F. Scotti;Category
Compromise of Minor's Claim
Case Outcome Type
Order Approving Minor's Compromise
Status
Closed
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 2 Civil Case Reassignment to Judge Richard F\. Scotti |
|
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account Proof provided. COURT ORDERED, CASE CLOSED. Judge: Adair, Valerie |
|
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Establishment of Blocked Trust Account Notice of Proof of Minor's Court Blocked Account |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Compromise Claim Order to Compromise Disputed Claim of Minor |
|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Petition to Compromise Disputed Claim of Minor |