Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Candah L Cordero, Plaintiff. vs. Conrado P Cordero, Defendant.
A Divorce - Complaint case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV. Judge Terrance P. Marren presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 16, 2008
Last Refreshed
November 23, 2020
Filing Location
Clark County, NV
Category
Divorce - Complaint
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disposal of Exhibits | |
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Petition and Order to Destroy / Dispose of Exhibits | |
May 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Vacate Evidentiary Hearing | |
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to Vacate Evidentiary hearing |
|
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to Vacate Evidentiary Hearing |
|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Henderson, Bill |
|
April 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service By Facsimile and Mail | |
April 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Trial Memorandum Pre-Hearing Memo |
|
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference with senior Judge Terrance Marren Judge: Henderson, Bill |
|
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing Status Check Judge: Henderson, Bill |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Filed Plaintiff's Status Report And Supplemental Documentation |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Financial Disclosure Form | |
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal Of Counsel For Pltff |
|
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Hearing Clerk of the Court's - Return Hearing |
|
April 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Decree Of Divorce |
|
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Decree of Divorce | |
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing for Divorce Vacated Judge: Henderson, Bill |
|
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing for Divorce Vacated - Moot Judge: Jones, Steven E |
|
January 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department C to Department R |
|
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rescheduling Of Hearing |
|
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Jones, Steven E) 11/04/2008, 01/20/2009(FIRM |
|
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Memorandum Candah L. Cordero |
|
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Receipt of Copy Plaintiff's Second Supplemental List Of Exhibits And Witnesses |
|
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement of Essential Facts |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Receipt of Copy Defendant's Second Supplemental Responses To Plaintiff's First Set Of Request For Production Of Documents |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition & Countermotion Deft's Opposition and Countermotion for Related Matters Judge: Schechtman, Morrisa |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions
Judge: Beecroft, Chris A., Jr. |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Pltf's Motion to Compel Discovery, Limit Testimony and Documentation at Trial and Attorney's Fees Judge: Schechtman, Morrisa |
|
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Witness List Defendant's Supplemental List Of Witnesses |
|
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Opposition and Countermotion | |
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Family Court Motion Opposition Fee Information Sheet | |
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
October 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Receipt of Copy | |
October 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion | |
September 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Rescheduling Of Hearing |
|
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Elliott, Jennifer |
|
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions CALENDAR CALL...RETURN HEARING: RESULTS OF COMPETENCY REPORT (PLAINTIFF) Judge: Elliott, Jennifer) CALENDAR CALL...RETURN HEARING: RESULTS OF COMPETENCY REPORT (PLAINTIFF |
|
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing Results of competency report - Plaintiff Judge: Elliott, Jennifer |
|
September 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion Ex Parte Motion To Vacate Trial And Stay Case |
|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
August 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service; Production of Documents |
|
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order From Hearing May 21,02008 |
|
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Witness List And Exhibits |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Receipt of Check |
|
July 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Rescheduling Of Hearing |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Service |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Joint Case Conference Report | |
May 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order Settlement Conference and/or Evidentiary Hearing and/or Trial Management Order |
|
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion For Mental Examination of Plaintiff |
|
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing PRIVATE MEDIATION Judge: Elliott, Jennifer |
|
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Referral Order for Outsourced Evaluation Services | |
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Affidavits in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion |
|
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Early Case Conference Defendant's Early Case Conference Disclosure Pursuant to NRCP 16.1 |
|
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Service |
|
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit Of Conrado P. Cordero In Support Of Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions
Judge: Elliott, Jennifer |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition & Countermotion Deft's Opposition and Countermotion for Related Matters Judge: Elliott, Jennifer |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion Pltf's Motion to List for Temporary Orders to Sell Real Property, for Spousal Support and Attorney's Fees Judge: Elliott, Jennifer |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order For Private Outsourced Mediation |
|
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Service By Facsmile Transmission |
|
March 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Opposition and Countermotion | |
March 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Family Court Motion Opposition Fee Information Sheet | |
March 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Financial Condition Conrado Cordero |
|
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing In Motion And Certificate Of Service |
|
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer and Counterclaim Verified Answer and Counterclaim to Plaintiff's Complaint for Divorce |
|
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service of Summons and Complaint Affidavit of Service |
|
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice Of Department Reassignment Pursuant To NRS 3.025(3) | |
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lis Pendens |
|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Family Court Motion Opposition Fee Information Sheet | |
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure | |
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion | |
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Domestic Relations Affidavit of Financial Condition | |
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint for Divorce |