Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ashley Welch, Plaintiff vs. Kirk Welch, Defendant.
A Divorce - Complaint case was filed in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV. Judge Rhonda K. Forsberg presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 06, 2022
Last Refreshed
February 14, 2023
Filing Location
Clark County, NV
Category
Divorce - Complaint
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Dismissal
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice Doc ID# 6 [6] Order of Dismissal without Prejudice |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause RE: NRCP 4(e)(2) |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Doc ID# 5 [5] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NRCP 4(e)(2) |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Pursuant to Administrative Order 22-14 - Reassigned to Judge Mari D. Parlade Judge: ChangePursuant to Administrative Order 22-14 - Reassigned to Judge Mari D. Parlade |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department A Pursuant to Administrative Order 22-09 - Case reassigned from Judge Rhonda K. Forsberg to Vacant, FC A |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Joint Preliminary Injunction Doc ID# 4 [4] Joint Preliminary Injunction |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction Doc ID# 2 [2] Request for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Electronically Issued - Service Pending Doc ID# 3 [3] Summons |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Complaint for Divorce Doc ID# 1 [1] Complaint for Divorce |